Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2620549

EP2620549 - Paver with controllable conveyor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Joseph-Vögele-Straße 1
67067 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2013/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Bertz, Klaus
Spitalstrasse 45
67596 Dittelsheim-Hessloch / DE
02 / Noll, Tobias
Hainfelder Strasse 3
76835 Roschbach / DE
03 / Weiser, Ralf
Mühlgewannweg 18
68526 Ladenburg / DE
04 / de Santis, Alessandro
Hinterstrasse 67
67245 Lambsheim / DE
 [2013/31]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12000504.626.01.2012
[2013/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2620549
Date:31.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2620549
Date:14.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/48, // E01C19/20
[2013/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
TitleGerman:Strassenfertiger mit steuerbaren Fördereinrichtungen[2013/31]
English:Paver with controllable conveyor devices[2013/31]
French:Finisseuse de route dotée de dispositifs de transport pouvant être commandés[2013/31]
Examination procedure07.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
20.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2014Fee for grant paid
26.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
Opponent's representative
Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
 02  13.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/42]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
Opponent's representative
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
 02  13.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
Opponent's representative
Murnane, Graham John
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
 02  13.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/04]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
Opponent's representative
Murnane, Graham John
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
19.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0966/17
20.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.01.2012
AL14.05.2014
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
AT26.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU26.01.2012
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MK14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
AT26.01.2017
Former [2018/24]HU26.01.2012
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
AT26.01.2017
Former [2017/39]HU26.01.2012
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
SM14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2017/03]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/07]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE26.01.2015
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU26.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/36]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/30]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/12]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
RS14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY14.05.2014
ES14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY14.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102007033456  (CATERPILLAR PAVING PROD [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3,13;
 [X]US3537363  (LONG GEORGE E, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 21 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2025811  (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [A] 3,13 * paragraph [0007] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2366830  (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0049] * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE9308170U
 US3678817
 EP0279795
 DE202004004082U
 DE19680396