Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2487925

EP2487925 - Multi-functional display device and method for displaying content on the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Uniyoung
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
02 / Jang, Saehun
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
03 / Lee, Gangseub
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
04 / Lee, Hyungnam
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
05 / Angarkar, Vithal
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
06 / Rathinavel, Raja
c/o Seocho R&D Campus
LG Electronics Inc.
221 Yangjae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-130 / KR
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12000576.430.01.2012
[2012/33]
Priority number, dateUS201161441632P10.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161441632 P
US201161479865P28.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161479865 P
KR2011008659929.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110086599
KR2011008659629.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110086596
[2012/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2487925
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2487925
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/4788, H04N21/462, H04N21/4227
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Multifunktionsanzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Anzeige von Inhalten auf selbiger[2012/33]
English:Multi-functional display device and method for displaying content on the same[2012/33]
French:Dispositif d'affichage multifonction et procédé pour afficher le contenu sur celui-ci[2012/33]
Examination procedure30.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
19.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination22.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0766/15
24.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010037277  (FLYNN-RIPLEY MEREDITH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] *