Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2482244

EP2482244 - Method and system for determining fraud in a card-not-present transaction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.08.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mastercard International, Inc.
2000 Purchase Street
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2012/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Janet
13002 Huntercreek Road
Des Peres, MO 63131 / US
02 / Chrisholm, John D.
317, Willowick Drive
Ballwin, MO 63011 / US
03 / Gerber, Johan
2808 Peppermill Lake Ct.
Wildwood, MO 63005 / US
04 / Salazar, Clara
1134 Foxworth Ct.
Ballwin, MO 63011 / US
05 / Wickman, Matthew
1064 Dardenne Woods Dr.
O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US
06 / Meyer, Susan
3487 Wainwright St.
St. Charles, MO 63301 / US
07 / Cordero, Rachael Vahle
630, Sunward Drive
O'Fallon, MO 63368 / US
08 / Merz, Christopher
10 FLowery Branch Place
Wildwood, MO 63040 / US
 [2012/31]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date12000579.830.01.2012
[2012/31]
Priority number, dateUS201161437480P28.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161437480 P
US20121336053727.01.2012         Original published format: US201213360537
[2012/50]
Former [2012/31]US20111343748028.01.2011
US20121336053727.01.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2482244
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2482244
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/40
[2012/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Bestimmung von Betrug in einer Karte nicht präsent-Transaktion[2012/31]
English:Method and system for determining fraud in a card-not-present transaction[2012/31]
French:Procédé et système pour déterminer la fraude dans une transaction en l'absence de carte[2012/31]
Examination procedure11.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/17]
12.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0480/15
12.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2008117171  (PURE COMMERCE PTY LTD [AU]; SHARMA SUNIL [AU]) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 *;
 [I]US2007174164  (BIFFLE JANET L [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0068] - [0070] *;
 [I]WO9406103  (HNC INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * computer system connected to a conventional financial data facility;; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2008140576  (LEWIS MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0224] - [0233]; figure 8 *