Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2482244


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.01.2020 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.10.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.10.2019 Change: Appeal number
22.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2015 Change: Appeal number
04.03.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.12.2014 New entry: Appeal number
06.10.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.10.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
22.04.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.08.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.04.2013 First examination report
22.03.2013 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
18.03.2013 Amendment by applicant
09.11.2012 Change - priority published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
10.08.2012 Publication of search report published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
10.08.2012 Change - classification published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
31.07.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]