Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2497451

EP2497451 - Hygiene product, method for producing a hygiene product and device for producing a hygiene product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W. Pelz GmbH & Co. KG
Willy-Pelz-Strasse 8-9
23812 Wahlstedt/Holstein / DE
[2012/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Bark, Andreas
Steenbarg 11
22397 Hamburg / DE
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Siemons, Norbert
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12001502.906.03.2012
[2012/37]
Priority number, dateDE2011101370711.03.2011         Original published format: DE102011013707
[2012/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2497451
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2497451
Date:18.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/47, A61F13/532
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
TitleGerman:Bindenprodukt, Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Hygieneproduktes und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Hygieneproduktes[2012/37]
English:Hygiene product, method for producing a hygiene product and device for producing a hygiene product[2012/37]
French:Produit hygiènique, procédé de fabrication d'un produit d'hygiène et dispositif de fabrication d'un produit d'hygiène[2012/37]
Examination procedure11.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/17]
23.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2014Fee for grant paid
28.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.03.2015  20.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2015  20.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/17]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2015   
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
22.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2284/16
07.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2012
AL18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
BE31.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU06.03.2012
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
BE31.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU06.03.2012
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
BE31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/36]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY18.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2008044616  (HANAO HIROYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * figures 12,18,24-33 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0077] , [0179] , [0180] * [Y] 7,11,12,17,18;
 [XY]DE19806575  (KIMBERLY CLARK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * page 6, line 67 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 2 - page 8, line 4 * * claims 1,6,28,29,38 * * figures 5-9 * [Y] 7;
 [XY]US2003118780  (ADAM GABRIEL HAMMAN [US] ET AL) [X] 9,10,12-16,18 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0029]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 11,17;
 [X]US4994053  (LANG THEODORE B [US]) [X] 9,10,13 * figures 1-14 *;
 [XY]US2010022978  (KASAI TAKAO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-11,13-16 * figures 1-50 * * paragraphs [0117] , [0159] * [Y] 7,12,17,18