Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2499906

EP2499906 - Dog urinal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.2015
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOG production s.r.o.
Zahrebska 2480/43
616 00 Brno / CZ
[2012/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Tomecek, Frantisek
Zahrebska 2480/43
61600 Brno / CZ
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Kania, Frantisek
Kania Sedlak Smola
Mendlovo Namesti 1 a
603 00 Brno / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Kania, Frantisek
Kania Sedlak Smola, Mendlovo Namesti 1 a
603 00 Brno / CZ
Application number, filing date12001727.214.03.2012
[2012/38]
Priority number, dateCZ20110024078U17.03.2011         Original published format: CZ 201124078 U
[2012/38]
Filing languageCS
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2499906
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2499906
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/01
[2012/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
TitleGerman:Urinal für Hunde[2013/43]
English:Dog urinal[2012/38]
French:Urinoir pour chiens[2013/43]
Former [2012/38]Urinal für Hunde
Former [2012/38]Urinoir pour des chiens
Examination procedure15.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/17]
16.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2014Fee for grant paid
17.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2013
Opposition(s)15.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2012
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MK12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
TR12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
LU14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
[2018/31]
Former [2016/33]HU14.03.2012
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
TR12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
LU14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU14.03.2012
BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2016/22]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2016/12]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2015/36]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2015/18]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
IT12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2015/12]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2015/07]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
IE14.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2015/02]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
NL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
SE12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0852111  (RODRIGUEZ NAVARRO FRANCOIS [AD]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2419015  (PONENTI LUCIEN [FR]) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 *;
 [AD]JP2005013182  (OTAGAKI MICHIKO) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [AD]JP2003061499  (NAKAKAWAJI KOFUKUKA) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2562764  (NAVARRO MARTIN ANTONIO [ES]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *;
 [A]CH662243  (UNTERWEGER ALFRED) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2005013182
 JP2003061499