blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2499906 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2499906



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 101
16.01.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.01.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
11.04.2013 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
16.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
16.03.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
16.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.10.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
24.09.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.09.2012 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
22.08.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.06.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 2
27.06.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
10.04.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
10.04.2012 Description Search / examination 5
10.04.2012 Drawings Search / examination 3
10.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.04.2012 Priority document Search / examination 10
10.04.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
10.04.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 5
14.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2012 Drawings filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 3
14.03.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
14.03.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 5