blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2499906


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
13.02.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
16.01.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
09.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2015  [2015/07]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
10.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
07.02.2014 (Expected) grant published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
28.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.09.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2013 Change - German title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - French title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
16.08.2013 Change - classification published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
16.08.2013 Change - German title published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
16.08.2013 Change - French title published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
22.03.2013 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
19.03.2013 Amendment by applicant
18.09.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.09.2012  [2012/38]