blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2499906
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2499906Global Dossier 12.03.2014B1
EP2499906 19.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
CZ201124078 17.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ22348U 22.06.2011U1
Priority number Date
CZ201124078 17.03.2011