Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2502740

EP2502740 - Film compound [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Watermann Polyworks GmbH
Stoppelkamp 1
32758 Detmold / DE
[2012/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Watermann, Markus
Fasanenweg 2
32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Helwig, Hans-Martin , et al
Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Salierring 47-53
50677 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Holland, Ralf , et al
Eikel & Partner GbR, Hünenweg 15
32760 Detmold / DE
Application number, filing date12001850.219.03.2012
[2012/39]
Priority number, dateDE20112004263U22.03.2011         Original published format: DE 202011004263 U
[2012/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2502740
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:B32B7/14, E04B1/66, E04D5/10, E04D13/16
[2012/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Folienverbund[2012/39]
English:Film compound[2012/39]
French:Film composite[2012/39]
Examination procedure26.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
01.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
29.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
19.06.2013Request for further processing filed
19.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3022019  (BERLEBURGER SCHAUMSTOFFWERK [DE]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,6 * * figure 1 *