Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2502762

EP2502762 - Control device for a tow bar and tow bar with a control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[2012/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Beutin, Jörg
Bonhoefferstrasse 26
33334 Gütersloh / DE
02 / Röscheisen, Daniel
Ahornallee 11
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2015/30]
Former [2012/39]01 / Beutin, Jörg
Bonhoefferstrasse 26
33334 Gütersloh / DE
02 / Röscheisen, Daniel
Ahornallee 11
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Essslingen / DE
Former [2014/41]Bregenzer, Michael , et al
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
Former [2012/39]Bregenzer, Michael , et al
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date12001994.821.03.2012
[2012/39]
Priority number, dateDE2011101488223.03.2011         Original published format: DE102011014882
DE201120101597U31.05.2011         Original published format: DE 202011101597 U
DE201120103345U14.07.2011         Original published format: DE 202011103345 U
[2012/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2502762
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2502762
Date:22.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/52, B60D1/54, B60D1/62
[2012/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2012/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuergerät für eine Anhängekupplung und Anhängekupplung mit einem Steuergerät[2012/39]
English:Control device for a tow bar and tow bar with a control device[2012/39]
French:Appareil de commande pour un attelage et attelage doté d'un appareil de commande[2012/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
09.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2015Fee for grant paid
09.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/22]
01.06.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0831/18
05.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
04.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0831/18
04.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2012
AL22.07.2015
BG22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
AT21.03.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU21.03.2012
BG22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
AT21.03.2017
Former [2018/29]HU21.03.2012
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU21.03.2012
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MK22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
SM22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/08]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB21.03.2016
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
LU21.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/21]DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/20]DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RS22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT22.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1225069  (FAC FRANK ABELS CONSULT & TECH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] , [0030] , [0033] , [0034] , [0037] , [0038] , [0042] * * figure 1 * [I] 5,6,14;
 [I]EP2233326  (SCAMBIA IND DEV AG [LI]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0026] , [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0105] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US7889062  (ALBISA HUBERT [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,13,15 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 25 * * column 5, line 46 - line 55 * * figures 1,3,4 *
OppositionDE20203270U
 EP1225069
 EP2233326
 US7889062
 DE102009012709
 DE102004037707
 DE102006060520
 DE102004009465
 DE10211572
 DE102010004336
 EP1702802