blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2515071

EP2515071 - Shape measurement device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.03.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2021Revocation of patentpublished on 28.04.2021  [2021/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
[2014/38]
Former [2012/43]For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki
Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nemoto, Kentaro
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
02 / Yamagata, Masaoki
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
03 / Iwamoto, Tadashi
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
04 / Machida, Nobuyoshi
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2012/43]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date12002237.128.03.2012
[2012/43]
Priority number, dateJP2011009173118.04.2011         Original published format: JP 2011091731
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2515071
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2515071
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:G01B11/03, G01B11/25, G06T7/00
[2012/43]
CPC:
G01B11/03 (EP,US); G01B11/2518 (EP,US); G06T7/521 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30164 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
TitleGerman:Formmessvorrichtung[2012/43]
English:Shape measurement device[2012/43]
French:Dispositif de mesure de forme[2012/43]
Examination procedure24.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/23]
13.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.08.2014Fee for grant paid
07.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.06.2015  23.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
 02  16.06.2015  23.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SmartRay GmbH
Bürgermeister-Finsterwalder-Ring 12
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [2016/17]
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  15.06.2015  23.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Gembruch, Christian
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Phoenixbau
Königstraße 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 02  16.06.2015  23.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SmartRay GmbH
Bürgermeister-Finsterwalder-Ring 12
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
24.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.01.2021Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/17]
16.03.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1653/17
26.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.01.2021Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
16.03.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
20.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1653/17
20.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.01.2021Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
16.03.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
19.01.2021Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2012
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB28.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU28.03.2012
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB28.03.2016
Former [2017/46]HU28.03.2012
AT17.09.2014
BE17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB28.03.2016
Former [2017/38]HU28.03.2012
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB28.03.2016
Former [2017/08]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB28.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE28.03.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU28.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU28.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU28.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007097381  (TOBIASON JOSEPH D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US6268918  (TANABE HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 11, lines 10-55; figures 3,5,16 * [Y] 1,2;
 [XY]US2003071194  (MUELLER FREDERICK F [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0075] - [0085]; figures 6-8 * [Y] 1,2
by applicantJP2009534969
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.