Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2515071 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2515071



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1425
24.03.2021 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
23.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2021 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
16.03.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.03.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.03.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
29.01.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
29.01.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
29.01.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
29.01.2021 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
15.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.03.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
25.03.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
20.03.2020 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
10.03.2020 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
10.03.2020 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
10.03.2020 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.03.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.03.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
25.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.02.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
07.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
07.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
07.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
27.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.12.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2019 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.10.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.09.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
17.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
17.01.2018 Claims Appeal 1
17.01.2018 Claims Appeal 1
17.01.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 26
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.09.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
20.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
20.09.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
20.09.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 74
20.09.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.09.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
10.08.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
09.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.08.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
21.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
26.05.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.05.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
26.05.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.05.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
26.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
26.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
26.05.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.03.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 6
22.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Description Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Description Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
24.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
23.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
20.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
05.08.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.08.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
24.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
24.03.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
09.03.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
04.03.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 4
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 38
24.07.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
24.07.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
26.06.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.06.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.06.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
16.06.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
16.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
16.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
15.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
15.06.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
15.06.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.06.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.06.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.06.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.09.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.05.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
01.04.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.03.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
04.02.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
13.12.2013 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.04.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
24.04.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.10.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.08.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.08.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2012 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
28.03.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 Description Search / examination 15
28.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2012 Drawings Search / examination 7
28.03.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8