Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2525130

EP2525130 - Insert hose for cladding and retrofitting pipes and channels, in particular waste water channels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMPREG GmbH
Eisenbahnstraße 32
72119 Ammerbuch / DE
[2012/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Papp, Robert
Tannenweg 7
71159 Mötzingen / DE
 [2012/47]
Representative(s)Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/47]Bartels & Partner
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12003014.328.04.2012
[2012/47]
Priority number, dateDE20111010213520.05.2011         Original published format: DE102011102135
[2012/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2525130
Date:21.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2525130
Date:27.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/46, B29C35/08, E03F3/06, F16L55/165
[2014/50]
Former International [2012/47]F16L55/165
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/47]
TitleGerman:Einlegeschlauch zum Auskleiden und Sanieren von Rohrleitungen und Kanälen, insbesondere von Abwasserkanälen[2012/47]
English:Insert hose for cladding and retrofitting pipes and channels, in particular waste water channels[2012/47]
French:Tuyau d'insertion destiné à l'habillage et au nettoyage de conduites et de canaux, en particulier de canaux d'eaux usées[2012/47]
Examination procedure20.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
21.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2015Fee for grant paid
10.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.02.2016  04.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, OH 43659 / US
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 [2019/04]
Former [2018/49]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2016  04.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, OH 43659 / US
Opponent's representative
Bailey, Sam Rogerson
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Former [2016/14]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2016   
OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, OH 43659 / US
Opponent's representative
Lenthall, Joseph
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
05.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0145/18
13.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.04.2012
AL27.05.2015
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
AT28.04.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/40]HU28.04.2012
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
AT28.04.2017
Former [2018/31]HU28.04.2012
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU28.04.2012
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU28.04.2012
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/38]CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE28.04.2016
FR02.05.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
FR02.05.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
IT27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/09]DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/07]DK27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
PT28.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1443257  (NORDITUBE TECHNOLOGIES AB [BE]) [X] 1,6,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-3; claims 1-17 * [I] 2-5,7,8;
 [X]EP2226184  (SHONAN GOSEI JUSHI SEISAKUSHO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *;
 [I]DE102004011388  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2011083765  (STARK KURT [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0050801
 DE3546417
 DD133953
OppositionEP1443257
 EP2226184
 DE102004011388
 US2011083765
 JP2007301953
 DE202010016048U
 JP2009248410
 US2009139593
 EP1308477
 EP2357065
 US2010012214
 US2004195731
    - WALLENBERGER et al., "Composites; Glass Fibers", WALLENBERGER et al., Miracle & S L Donaldson D B, ASM Handbook, vol. 21, pages 27 - 34, XP002684388
    - KEES DEN BESTEN et al., "Paper 3B-3", "International No-Dig 2011'' 29th International Conference and Exhibition, Berlin, Germany, (20110502), XP055309649
    - Owens Corning TM, "Advantex tm Boron-Free E-CR Glass Reinforcement Products", OCV Reinforcements Advantex Glass Information Sheet, (20100400), pages 1 - 2, XP055309655
    - KEVIN SPOO et al., "An inside look at corrosion in composite laminates", (20100400), pages 1 - 11, XP055195824
    - Owens Corning, "Glass Fiber Reinforcement Chemical Resistance Guide- For the Selection of Glass Fiber Reinfocements in Fiber Reinforced Polymer (FRP) for Corrosive", (20110300), XP055310094
    - Owens Corning Fiberglas, "Technical Data Sheet WRy0500/S375/04D00", (20101018), page 1
    - Aliancys, "Synolite TM 2103-Q-1 /Version:02229/11.0/", Product Data sheet, (20151200), pages 1 - 2, XP055310094