Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2523164

EP2523164 - Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and image processing program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
[2016/40]
Former [2016/39]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Former [2016/34]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
Former [2012/46]For all designated states
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kanda, Yamato
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
02 / Kitamura, Makoto
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
03 / Hirota, Masashi
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
04 / Kono, Takashi
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
05 / Matsuda, Takehiro
OLYMPUS CORPORATION
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
 [2016/45]
Former [2012/46]01 / Kanda, Yamato
c/o Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
02 / Kitamura, Makoto
c/o Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
03 / Hirota, Masashi
c/o Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
04 / Kono, Takashi
c/o Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
05 / Matsuda, Takehiro
c/o Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Representative(s)Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/28]
Former [2012/46]Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12003438.404.05.2012
[2012/46]
Priority number, dateJP2011010469809.05.2011         Original published format: JP 2011104698
[2012/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2523164
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2523164
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/12, G06T7/162, G06T7/143
[2018/11]
Former International [2012/46]G06T7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/46]
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Bildverarbeitungsprogramm[2012/46]
English:Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and image processing program[2012/46]
French:Appareil de traitement d'images numériques, procédé de traitement d'images numériques et programme de traitement d'images numériques[2018/28]
Former [2012/46]Appareil de traitement dýimages numériques, procédé de traitement dýimages numériques et programme de traitement dýimages numériques
Examination procedure04.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
14.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2018Fee for grant paid
04.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2014
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2011069876  (KANDA YAMATO [JP]) [Y] 1-13,15,17-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * [A] 14,16;
 [YA]  - BILODEAU G A ET AL, "Multistage graph-based segmentation of thoracoscopic images", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.COMPMEDIMAG.2006.07.003, ISSN 0895-6111, (20061201), pages 437 - 446, (20061201), XP024903636 [Y] 1-13,15,17-19 * abstract * * page 438, paragraph 3 * * page 440, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 441, reight col., section 3.3.2. * [A] 14,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compmedimag.2006.07.003
Examination   - YURI BOYKOV ET AL, "Graph Cuts and Efficient N-D Image Segmentation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (20061101), vol. 70, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s11263-006-7934-5, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 109 - 131, XP055157350

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11263-006-7934-5
by applicantJP2009232962
 WO2006080239
    - Y. BOYKOV; M. JOLLY, "Interactive Graph Cuts for Optimal Boundary & Region Segmentation of Objects in N-D Images", PROCEEDING OF ''INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (200107), vol. 1, pages 105 - 112
    - "CG-ARTS Association", DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 114 - 121
    - LUC VINCENT; PIERRE SOILLE, "Watersheds in Digital Spaces: An Efficient Algorithm Based on Immersion Simulations", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (199106), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 583 - 598
    - "CG-ARTS Association", DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 178 - 179