Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2674543

EP2674543 - A roof window structure with a lock, and a lock for such a window [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.01.2015  [2015/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VKR Holding A/S
Breeltevej 18
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2013/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Knud, Jørgen, Larsen
Skovhegnet 27
3390 Hundested / DK
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)van Walstijn, Gerard
Nordic Patent Service A/S
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]van Walstijn, Bartholomeus G. G.
Nordic Patent Service A/S
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date12004448.213.06.2012
[2013/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2674543
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:E04D13/035, E05C17/48, E05B63/12, E05C5/02
[2013/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Dachfensterstruktur mit einem Schloss, und Schloss für ein solches Fenster[2013/51]
English:A roof window structure with a lock, and a lock for such a window[2013/51]
French:Structure de fenêtre de toiture munie d'un verrou et serrure pour une telle fenêtre[2013/51]
Examination procedure19.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/03]
22.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IAY]US5205073  (LYONS SR ROBERT [US]) [I] 1-3 * column 1, line 7 - line 16; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 15 - line 21 * [A] 14 [Y] 4-13;
 [XY]AU409366B  (YOSHITAKA NAKANISHI) [X] 14-16 * page 4, line 28 - page 10, line 10; figures 1-11 * [Y] 4-13;
 [XA]AU7478381  (CHUBB & SONS LOCK & SAFE CO) [X] 14-17 * figures 1-9 * [A] 1,4-13;
 [A]DE801812  (FABER CASTELL A W) [A] 1,4-17 * column 2, line 37 - line 81; figures 1-5,8-11 *;
 [A]DE102007002014  (JOKEL GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE102004040175  (RIEGELHOF & GAERTNER OHG [DE]) [A] 1-15,17 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]WO2007139410  (FAKRO PP SPOLKA ZOO [PL], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 24; figures 1-10 *
by applicantEP1537285
 DE4328330
 EP2281984