Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2597838

EP2597838 - MOBILE TERMINAL AND IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS MOUNTED IN A CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/22]Mobile terminal, image display apparatus mounted in car and data processing method using the same
[2018/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2013/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Jungwoo
Intellectual Property Center
LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 South Korea / KR
02 / Choi, Sungha
Intellectual Property Center
LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 South Korea / KR
03 / Kim, Mingoo
Intellectual Property Center
LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 South Korea / KR
 [2013/22]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/36]
Former [2013/22]Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12004960.604.07.2012
[2013/22]
Priority number, dateUS201161563838P28.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563838 P
[2013/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2597838
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2597838
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, B60K35/00, B60K37/00, B60K37/06, H04L29/08
[2018/10]
Former International [2013/22]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/22]
TitleGerman:MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND IN EINEM AUTO ANGEBRACHTE BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2018/10]
English:MOBILE TERMINAL AND IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS MOUNTED IN A CAR[2018/10]
French:TERMINAL MOBILE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE[2018/12]
Former [2013/22]Mobiles Endgerät, in einem Auto angebrachte Bildanzeigevorrichtung und Datenverarbeitungsverfahren damit
Former [2013/22]Mobile terminal, image display apparatus mounted in car and data processing method using the same
Former [2013/22]Terminal mobile, appareil d'affichage d'image monté sur véhicule et procédé de traitement de données l'utilisant
Examination procedure04.07.2012Examination requested  [2013/22]
17.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2018Fee for grant paid
20.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2017
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018