Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639545

EP2639545 - Optical imaging method and optical imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho
Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON
75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8580 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yuan, Zhijia
c/o TOPCON MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC.
111 Bauer Drive
Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US
02 / Wang, Zhenguo
c/o TOPCON MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC.
111 Bauer Drive
Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US
03 / Chan, Kinpui
c/o TOPCON MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC.
111 Bauer Drive
Oakland New Jersey 07436 / US
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Gagel, Roland
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel
Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Gagel, Roland
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date12004989.505.07.2012
[2013/38]
Priority number, dateUS20121341857913.03.2012         Original published format: US201213418579
[2013/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639545
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, A61B3/10
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optisches Bildgebungsverfahren und optische Bildgebungsvorrichtung[2013/38]
English:Optical imaging method and optical imaging apparatus[2013/38]
French:Procédé d'imagerie optique et appareil d'imagerie optique[2013/38]
Examination procedure14.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2551632  (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *;
    [XDAI] VERGNOLE S ET AL, "Artifact removal in Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography with a piezoelectric fiber stretcher", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20080401), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1364/OL.33.000732, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 732 - 734, XP001513024 [XD] 1,3-6,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 2,10 [I] 7,8,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.33.000732
    [XDAI] GOETZINGER E ET AL, "High speed full range complex spectral domain optical coherence tomography", OPTICS EXPRESS, OSA (OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA), WASHINGTON DC, (US), (20050124), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1364/OPEX.13.000583, ISSN 1094-4087, pages 583 - 594, XP002554362 [XD] 1,4-6,9,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 2,10 [I] 3,7,8,11,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OPEX.13.000583
    [XDAI] LEITGEB R ET AL, "Phase-shifting algorithm to achieve high-speed long-depth-range probing by frequency-domain optical coherence tomography", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20031115), vol. 28, no. 22, doi:10.1364/OL.28.002201, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 2201 - 2203, XP002388372 [XD] 1,6,9,14 * the whole document * [A] 2,10 [I] 3,7,8,11,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.28.002201
by applicantWO2006127952
    WOJTKOWSKI, M.; A. KOWALCZYK; R. LEITGEB; A.F. FERCHER, "Full range complex spectral optical coherence tomography technique in eye imaging", OPT LETT, (2002), vol. 27, no. 16, pages 1415 - 7,
    LEITGEB, R.A.; C.K. HITZENBERGER; A.F. FERCHER; T. BAJRASZEWSKI, "Phase-shifting algorithm to achieve high-speed long-depth-range probing by frequency-domain optical coherence tomography", OPT. LETT., (2003), vol. 28, no. 22, pages 2201 - 2203,
    GOTZINGER, E.; M. PIRCHER; R. LEITGEB; C. HITZENBERGER, "High speed full range complex spectral domain optical coherence tomography", OPT EXPRESS, (2005), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 583 - 94,
    WANG, R.K., "Fourier domain optical coherence tomography achieves full range complex imaging in vivo by introducing a carrier frequency during scanning", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 52, no. 19, pages 5897 - 907,
    LEITGEB, R.A.; R. MICHAELY; T. LASSER; S.C. SEKHAR, "Complex ambiguity-free Fourier domain optical coherence tomography through transverse scanning", OPT. LETT., (2007), vol. 32, no. 23, pages 3453 - 3455,
    AN, L.; R.K. WANG, "Use of a scanner to modulate spatial interferograms for in vivo full-range Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography", OPT. LETT., (2007), vol. 32, no. 23, pages 3423 - 3425,
    YASUNO, Y.; S. MAKITA; T. ENDO; G. AOKI; M. ITOH; T. YATAGAI, "Simultaneous B-M-mode scanning method for real-time full-range Fourier domain optical coherence tomography", APPL OPT, (2006), vol. 45, no. 8, pages 1861 - 5,
    VERGNOLE, S.; G. LAMOUCHE; M.L. DUFOUR, "Artifact removal in Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography with a piezoelectric fiber stretcher", OPT LETT, (2008), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 732 - 4,
    MAKITA, S.; T. FABRITIUS; Y. YASUNO, "Full-range, high-speed, high-resolution 1 microm spectral-domain optical coherence tomography using BM-scan for volumetric imaging of the human posterior eye", OPT EXPRESS, (2008), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 8406 - 20,
    YUN, S.; G. TEARNEY; J. DE BOER; B. BOUMA, "Removing the depth-degeneracy in optical frequency domain imaging with frequency shifting", OPT EXPRESS, (2004), vol. 12, no. 20, pages 4822 - 8,
    ZHANG, J.; J.S. NELSON; Z. CHEN, "Removal of a mirror image and enhancement of the signal-to-noise ratio in Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography using an electro-optic phase modulator", OPT LETT, (2005), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 147 - 9,
    CHOMA, M.A.; C. YANG; J.A. IZATT, "Instantaneous quadrature low-coherence interferometry with 3 x 3 fiber-optic couplers", OPT LETT, (2003), vol. 28, no. 22, pages 2162 - 4,
    SARUNIC, M.V.; B.E. APPLEGATE; J.A. IZATT, "Real-time quadrature projection complex conjugate resolved Fourier domain optical coherence tomography", OPT LETT, (2006), vol. 31, no. 16, pages 2426 - 8,
    MAO, Y.; S. SHERIF; C. FLUERARU; S. CHANG, "3 x3 Mach-Zehnder interferometer with unbalanced differential detection for full-range swept-source optical coherence tomography", APPL. OPT., (2008), vol. 47, no. 12, pages 2004 - 2010,
    VAKHTIN, A.B.; K.A. PETERSON; D.J. KANE, "Resolving the complex conjugate ambiguity in Fourier-domain OCT by harmonic lock-in detection of the spectral interferogram", OPT LETT, (2006), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 1271 - 3,
    WANG, K.; Z. DING; Y. ZENG; J. MENG; M. CHEN, "Sinusoidal B-M method based spectral domain optical coherence tomography for the elimination of complex-conjugate artifact", OPT EXPRESS, (2009), vol. 17, no. 19, pages 16820 - 33,
    TAO, Y.K.; M. ZHAO; J.A. IZATT, "High-speed complex conjugate resolved retinal spectral domain optical coherence tomography using sinusoidal phase modulation", OPT LETT, (2007), vol. 32, no. 20, pages 2918 - 20,
    VAKHTIN, A.B.; K.A. PETERSON; D.J. KANE, "Demonstration of complex-conjugate-resolved harmonic Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography imaging of biological samples", APPL OPT, (2007), vol. 46, no. 18, pages 3870 - 7,