Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2554868

EP2554868 - Clutch actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sester, Christof
Engelgasse 11
77723 Gengenbach / DE
02 / Krahtov, Luben
Balzenbergerstrasse 39F
76530 Baden-Baden / DE
03 / Lörch, Herbert
Litzlungerstrasse 18
76547 Sinzheim / DE
04 / Bella, Ronald
Neckarstrasse 13
76437 Rastatt / DE
05 / Burgstahler, Dominic
Kastanienweg 14
76870 Kandel / DE
06 / Bosnjak, Daniel
Rue Ferdinand Hérold 29
67470 Seltz / FR
07 / Malitourne, Jerome
67 rue de Schifflange
67410 Drusenheim / FR
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12005193.313.07.2012
[2013/06]
Priority number, dateDE2011108054405.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011080544
DE20121020754207.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012207542
DE20121020994314.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012209943
[2013/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2554868
Date:06.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2554868
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:F16D25/08
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2013/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ausrücksystem[2013/06]
English:Clutch actuator[2013/06]
French:dispositif de débrayage[2013/06]
Examination procedure14.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/37]
19.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2015Fee for grant paid
26.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2016   
Valeo Embrayages
81, avenue Roger Dumoulin
80009 Amiens Cedex 2 / FR
Opponent's representative
Cardon, Nicolas
Valeo Embrayages
Sce Propriété Intellectuelle
Le Delta
14, avenue des Béguines
95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2016   
Valeo Embrayages
81, avenue Roger Dumoulin
80009 Amiens Cedex 2 / FR
Opponent's representative
Cardon, Nicolas
Valeo Embrayages
Propriété Intellectuelle
14 Avenue des Beguines
95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
15.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1836/17
10.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.07.2012
AL06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB13.07.2016
AT13.07.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/46]HU13.07.2012
AL06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB13.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU13.07.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB13.07.2016
Former [2017/38]HU13.07.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB13.07.2016
Former [2017/36]HU13.07.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB13.07.2016
Former [2017/22]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
IE13.07.2015
LU13.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU13.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU13.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU13.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/15]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
LU13.07.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/13]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE102009034399  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1-3; claims 1,3,5,6 * [Y] 6-9;
 [XAI]EP1677020  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1,2 * [A] 8,9 [I] 2;
 [YA]FR2780121  (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 6-9 * page 6 - page 11; figure 1 * [A] 4;
 [A]DE10138722  (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0034]; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE102010032661  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102009053486
OppositionDE102009034399
 EP1677020
 FR2780121
 DE10138722
 DE102010032661
 DE102009053486
 FR2782482
 EP0964191
 DE102010052387
 US2005217963
 FR2780123
 EP0185176
 FR2699627