Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2554770

EP2554770 - Clamping and shutting device for sealing pivotable door leaves for a removable container on opposing side walls of a container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rewald GmbH
Gierkezeile 23
10585 Berlin / DE
[2013/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Rewald, Stefan
Richard Wagner Strasse 49
10585 Berlin / DE
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Friedlander Strasse 37
12489 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Burghardt, Dieter
Anwaltskanzlei Burghardt & Burghardt
Am Falkenberg 60 A
12524 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date12005227.917.07.2012
[2013/06]
Priority number, dateDE20111010908701.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011109087
[2013/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2554770
Date:06.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2554770
Date:19.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:E05C9/08, // E05C7/04
[2017/16]
Former International [2013/06]E05C9/08, E05B65/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spann- und Schliesseinrichtung zum Verriegeln von an Containerseitenwänden schwenkbar gelagerten Türflügeln für einen aufnehmbaren Container[2013/06]
English:Clamping and shutting device for sealing pivotable door leaves for a removable container on opposing side walls of a container[2013/06]
French:Dispositif de serrage et de fermeture destiné à verrouiller des battants de porte installés de manière pivotante sur des parois latérales de conteneur pouvant être réceptionné[2013/06]
Examination procedure20.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/17]
05.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3737183  (PASTVA J) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 40 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-6 * [A] 5,6,9;
 [XA]EP1213421  (REWALD CONTAINERWECHSELSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,5,6;
 [XA]US3844591  (VELCOVER M) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-7 * [A] 5,6;
 [XA]GB1186757  (MINER INC W H [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 2, line 61 - page 3, line 64; figures 1-6 * [A] 8;
 [XDA]US3917328  (DE FILIPPI QUINTO) [XD] 1,4,5,7,9 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]US4601501  (PASTVA JOHN V [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 4, lines 9-11; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 49-53; figures 4,5 *
by applicantUS3917328