Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2554293 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2554293



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 63
14.12.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
12.09.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
11.02.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.01.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.12.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.12.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 2
05.12.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
14.08.2012 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Priority document Search / examination 21
01.08.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
20.07.2012 Description Search / examination 11
20.07.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Drawings Search / examination 4
20.07.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8