Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2554293


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.01.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.02.2014  [2014/06]
11.09.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.02.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.02.2013  [2013/06]