Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2554293

EP2554293 - Pipe forging method with cast hollow block [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.01.2014
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2014  [2014/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Meer GmbH
Ohlerkirchweg 66
41069 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2013/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Vohskämper, Ulrich
Hardter Waldstr. 140
41169 Mönchengladbach / DE
02 / Nieschwitz, Paul, Dr.
Reinhold-Klügel-Hof 35
41812 Erkelenz / DE
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Kross, Ulrich
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Kross, Ulrich
Hemmercih & Kollegen
Hammerstr. 3
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date12005323.620.07.2012
[2013/06]
Priority number, dateDE20111010907130.07.2011         Original published format: DE102011109071
[2013/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2554293
Date:06.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:B21J7/14, B21J5/00, B22D7/04
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rohrschmiedeverfahren mit urgeformtem Hohlblock[2013/06]
English:Pipe forging method with cast hollow block[2013/06]
French:Procédé de forgeage de tuyau avec bloc creux moulé[2013/06]
Examination procedure07.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/06]
12.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/06]
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102010012717  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,5,7,8;
 [XI]CN101722262  (BEIJING SHG TECHNOLOGY RES AND) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document * [I] 2,6,8
    [ ] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20100609), Database accession no. CN101722262 [ ] * abstract *
by applicantEP1814679