Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713624

EP2713624 - Method and system for generating an instantaneous decoding refresh (IDR) picture slice in an H.264/AVC compliant video data stream [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Digital Broadcast S.A.
Avenue de Tournay 7
1292 Chambesy / CH
[2014/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Dziecielewski, Tomasz
ADB Polska Sp. z.o.o.
ul. Trasa Polnocna 16
65-119 Zielona Gora / PL
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)Blonski, Pawel
Advanced Digital Broadcast Polska
Ul. Trasa Polnocna 16
65-119 Zielona Gora / PL
[2014/14]
Application number, filing date12006621.220.09.2012
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2713624
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/4402, H04N19/70, H04N19/40, H04N19/48
[2014/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Erzeugung eines sofortigen Decodier-Wiederhol (IDR) Bild-Slices in einem H.264/AVC-kompatiblen Videodatenstrom[2014/14]
English:Method and system for generating an instantaneous decoding refresh (IDR) picture slice in an H.264/AVC compliant video data stream[2014/14]
French:Procédé et système permettant de générer une tranche d'image d'actualisation de décodage instantané (IDR) dans un flux de données vidéo conforme à H.264/AVC[2014/14]
Examination procedure05.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
28.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
14.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
CH, DK, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DE, CZ, CY, BG, BE, AT, AL
22.12.2014Request for further processing filed
22.12.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
22.12.2014Request for further processing filed
22.12.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.01.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2249567  (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]  "Text of ISO/IEC 14496-10:200X / FDIS Advanced Video Coding (4th edition)", 81. MPEG MEETING;2-6-2007 - 6-6-2007; LAUSANNE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERTGROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20071028), no. N9198, ISSN 0000-0130, XP030015692 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] *
 [A]  WANG, "On Random Access", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020726), no. JVT-D097, ISSN 0000-0441, XP030005371 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS2012207454