Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2573267

EP2573267 - Maintenance train with a milling device and a transport device and a sensor device for distance monitoring, milling device having a sensor device and method for distance monitoring in a maintenance train [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.12.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOMAG GmbH
Hellerwald
56154 Boppard / DE
[2013/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Simon, Martin
Im Moorkamp 43
56332 Brodenbach / DE
 [2013/13]
Representative(s)Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwälte
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2013/13]Heidler, Philipp , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Landsberger Straße 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date12006629.521.09.2012
[2013/13]
Priority number, dateDE20111011418522.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114185
[2013/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2573267
Date:27.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2573267
Date:14.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:E01C23/088
[2013/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/13]
TitleGerman:Arbeitszug mit einer Fräsvorrichtung und einer Transporteinrichtung sowie einer Sensoreinrichtung zur Abstandsüberwachung, Fräsvorrichtung mit einer Sensoreinrichtung und Verfahren zur Abstandsüberwachung bei einem Arbeitszug[2013/13]
English:Maintenance train with a milling device and a transport device and a sensor device for distance monitoring, milling device having a sensor device and method for distance monitoring in a maintenance train[2013/13]
French:Train de traveaux avec un dispositif de fraisage et une installation de transport et un dispositif de capteur pour la surveillance à distance, dispositif de fraisage avec un dispositif de capteur et procédé de surveillance à distance avec un train de traveaux[2013/13]
Examination procedure06.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/29]
23.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2014Fee for grant paid
04.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.10.2015   
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Oppermann, Frank
OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP
Wilhelminenstrasse 1a
65193 Wiesbaden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  13.10.2015   
Wirtgen GmbH
Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2
53578 Windhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Oppermann, Frank
OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP
Washingtonstrasse 75
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
18.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0579/18
26.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.09.2012
AL14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB21.09.2016
AT21.09.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]HU21.09.2012
AL14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB21.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU21.09.2012
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB21.09.2016
Former [2017/38]HU21.09.2012
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
GB21.09.2016
Former [2017/22]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
FR30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE21.09.2015
LU21.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU21.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU21.09.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2016/03]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/39]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/38]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/37]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/36]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/35]ES14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES14.01.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE102005035480  (CFT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 27 - page 5, paragraph 28; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0667415  (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP2006448  (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102008015277  (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1219153  (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * column 33, line 14 - column 45, line 9; figure - *;
 [Y]EP1574122  (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19654626  (ARCH MINERAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 10 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *