Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2589504

EP2589504 - Draw bar with an evaluation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[2013/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Sielhorst, Bernhard
Ostmarkstrasse 26
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
02 / Kramer, Ulrich
Jüngstrasse 7
33602 Bielefeld / DE
03 / Pascher, Nikolas
Montessoriweg 11
33334 Gütersloh / DE
04 / Stockhaus, Tim
Vahlkamp 55
33719 Bielefeld / DE
 [2013/19]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Bregenzer, Michael , et al
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
Former [2014/38]Bregenzer, Michael
Patentanwälte
Magenbauer & Kollegen
Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Former [2013/19]Bregenzer, Michael
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date12007470.302.11.2012
[2013/19]
Priority number, dateDE20111011751803.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011117518
[2013/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2589504
Date:08.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2589504
Date:17.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/62, B60D1/24
[2013/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/19]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung mit einer Auswerteeinrichtung[2013/19]
English:Draw bar with an evaluation device[2013/19]
French:Attelage doté d'un dispositif d'évaluation[2014/04]
Former [2013/19]Attelage doté dýun dispositif dýévaluation
Examination procedure30.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
08.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2014Fee for grant paid
02.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14001086.9  / EP2767418
EP18150921.7  / EP3357717
EP19204002.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2015  16.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 02  17.06.2015   
Brink Towing Systems B.V.
Industrieweg 5
7951 CX Staphorst / NL
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/30]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2015  16.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 02  17.06.2015   
Brink Towing Systems B.V.
Industrieweg 5
7951 CX Staphorst / NL
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
Former [2015/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2015   
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
24.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition17.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1820/17
27.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1820/17
16.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.11.2012
AL17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB02.11.2016
AT02.11.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]HU02.11.2012
AL17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB02.11.2016
Former [2018/31]HU02.11.2012
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB02.11.2016
Former [2018/01]HU02.11.2012
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
GB02.11.2016
Former [2017/39]HU02.11.2012
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/33]HU02.11.2012
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/32]HU02.11.2012
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2016/31]BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/50]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/46]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE02.11.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/37]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/35]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/32]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/30]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU02.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010332049  (SY WILLIAMSON [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0021] , [0023] , [0024] , [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1,2,10 *;
 [A]EP2316669  (SCAMBIA IND DEV AG [LI]) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0118] * * figures 1,8,10 *;
 [A]US6196327  (PATEL KETAN B [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 45 - line 52 * * column 3, line 17 - line 27 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 4 * * column 9, line 20 - line 26 * * figures 1,4 *
by applicantDE102010009986