Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2560307

EP2560307 - Communications system using beamforming [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/44]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Schwager, Andreas
Rothaldenweg 49
71336 Waiblingen / DE
02 / Stadelmeier, Lothar
Schlossbergstraße 27
70569 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Schneider, Daniel
Kissingerstr. 70
70372 Stuttgart / DE
 [2013/23]
Former [2013/08]01 / Schwager, Andreas
Rothaldenweg 49
71336 Waiblingen / DE
02 / Stadelmeier, Lothar
Schlossbergstraße 27
70569 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Schneider, Daniel
Nauheimerstraße 67
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/44]
Former [2013/08]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Innere Wiener Straße 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date12007535.329.12.2010
[2013/08]
Priority number, dateEP2009001614430.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09016144
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2560307
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2560307
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/0417, H04B3/54, H04B3/50, H04B7/06, H04J11/00, H04L25/03
[2019/23]
Former International [2013/08]H04J11/00, H04B3/54, H04B3/50, H04L5/14, H04L25/02, H04L25/03, H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem mit Strahlformung[2013/08]
English:Communications system using beamforming[2013/08]
French:Système de communication utilisant une formation de faisceau[2013/08]
Examination procedure06.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/08]
02.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2019Fee for grant paid
20.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10798276.1  / EP2524453
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100798276) is  24.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP2061160  (SONY CORP [JP]) [YD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2008026763  (VAN RENSBURG CORNELIUS [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [XI]  - VITHANAGE C ET AL, "Precoding in OFDM-based multi-antenna ultra-wideband systems", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20090101), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2009.4752675, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 41 - 47, XP011280612 [X] 1 * abstract * * pages 41,46,47 * [I] 2-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2009.4752675
 [I]  - MAI VU ET AL, "MIMO Wireless Linear Precoding", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070901), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 86 - 105, XP011194357 [I] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - AMIRSHAHI P ET AL, "Fountain codes for impulsive noise correction in low-voltage indoor power-line broadband communications", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2006. CCNC 2006. 20 06 3RD IEEE LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 8-10 JAN. 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060108), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/CCNC.2006.1593069, ISBN 978-1-4244-0085-0, pages 473 - 477, XP010893253 [A] 1-14 * page 473, column r, line 36 - line 42 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCNC.2006.1593069
ExaminationUS7260079
    - N.H. Dawod ET AL, "Improved transmit null steering for MIMO-OFDM downlinks with distributed base station antenna arrays", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS., US, (20060301), vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1109/JSAC.2005.862385, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 419 - 426, XP055262015

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2005.862385
    - NISHIRNURA T ET AL, "Downlink beamforming performance for an SDMA terminal with joint detection", IEEE 54TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VTC FALL 2001. PROCEEDINGS 7-11 OCT. 2001 ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, USA; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], IEEE, IEEE 54TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VTC FALL 2001. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.01CH37211) IEEE P, (20011007), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/VTC.2001.956455, ISBN 978-0-7803-7005-0, pages 1538 - 1542, XP010562219

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.956455
by applicantWO2004038952
 US2007177681
 EP2019496
 EP2061160