Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2592290

EP2592290 - Multi-layer sliding bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.05.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Mahle Engine Systems UK Limited
2 Central Park Drive
Central Park
Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 0WE / GB
For all designated states
Mahle Composants Moteur France SAS
PO Box BP 104
27 route de la Foire
74650 Chavanod / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Mahle Engine Systems UK Limited
2 Central Park Drive
Central Park
Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 0WE / GB
For all designated states
Mahle Composants Moteur France SAS
PO Box BP 104
27 route de la Foire
74650 Chavanod / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fortune, Cedric
15b Rue Ves Echelles
74100 Annemasse / FR
02 / Laing, Ian Mathew
29 Holbrook Avenue
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2QG / GB
03 / Forder, Jon
16 Acacia Grove
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2QT / GB
 [2013/20]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater , et al
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Pohle, Reinhard
Mahle International GmbH
Patentabteilung ZRIP
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/20]Pohle, Reinhard
Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12007631.009.11.2012
[2013/20]
Priority number, dateGB2011001930509.11.2011         Original published format: GB 201119305
[2013/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2592290
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2592290
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/20, B32B15/00, B32B27/00, C23C28/00
[2013/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/20]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtgleitlager[2013/20]
English:Multi-layer sliding bearing[2013/20]
French:Palier lisse multi-couches[2013/20]
Examination procedure08.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
15.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2014Fee for grant paid
27.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.09.2015   
Miba Gleitlage Austria GmbH
Dr. Mitterbauer-Straße 3
4663 Laakirchen / AT
Opponent's representative
Burger, Hannes
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
 [2015/44]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.05.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1665/17
20.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.11.2012
AL14.01.2015
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE09.11.2015
LU09.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU09.11.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE09.11.2015
LU09.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU09.11.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE09.11.2015
LU09.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE09.11.2015
LU09.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU09.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU09.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2016/24]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2016/03]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/37]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/36]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/35]ES14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES14.01.2015
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2008187260  (SCHUBERT WERNER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,10,11,16-19,21-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [1618] , [0021] , [0022] , [0023] , [0028] * [Y] 7-9,12-15,20 [I] 2;
 [XI]US2006245675  (LANG HUBERT [AT]) [X] 1,3,10,16,17,19,21-23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0035] , [0043] , [0044] , [0053] , [0070] * * figure 1 * [I] 2,18;
 [XI]EP0395130  (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG [DE]) [X] 1,11,17-19,21-23 * column 1, lines 1-3 * * column 2, lines 36-43 * * column 3, lines 15-34 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 4 * * figure - * [I] 2,16;
 [YA]GB2465852  (MAHLE ENGINE SYSTEMS UK LTD [GB]; MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8,9,20 * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 3, lines 8-12, 30-32 * * page 4, lines 28-32 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, lines 16-19, 21-26 * * page 6, lines 5-9 * * claims 1,3,8,9,10 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US2008159671  (LEONARDELLI GEORG [AT]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] - [0055] , [0058] , [0061] - [0064] * [A] 1,8,16-18;
 [YA]DE102008060765  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * [A] 11,16-18;
 [A]GB2271779  (DAIDO METAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 1, lines 3-8 * * page 2, lines 21-24 *