Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2740761

EP2740761 - POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED BALANCE OF SLOW CRACK GROWTH RESISTANCE, IMPACT PERFORMANCE AND PIPE PRESSURE RESISTANCE FOR PIPE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/24]Polyethylene composition with improved balance of slow crack growth resistance, impact performance and pipe pressure resistance for pipe applications
[2016/23]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2020Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 11.03.2020 [2020/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2014/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Tynys, Antti
Paracelsusstr. 11
4020 Linz / AT
02 / Braun, Juliane
Tomaschekweg 32
4040 Linz / AT
03 / Rätzsch, Thomas
Alpenblick 2
4203 Altenberg / AT
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/42]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2014/24]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date12008142.705.12.2012
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2740761
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2740761
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/06, C08L23/08, F16L9/12
[2014/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
Former [2014/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Polyethylenzusammensetzung mit verbessertem Gleichgewicht zwischen Beständigkeit gegen langsames Risswachstum, Einflussleistung und Rohrdruckbeständigkeit für Rohranwendungen[2019/27]
English:POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED BALANCE OF SLOW CRACK GROWTH RESISTANCE, IMPACT PERFORMANCE AND PIPE PRESSURE RESISTANCE FOR PIPE APPLICATIONS[2016/23]
French:Composition de polyéthylène présentant un équilibre amélioré de résistance à la propagation des fissures lentes, la résistance aux chocs et une résistance à la pression des tuyaux pour des applications de tuyaux[2019/27]
Former [2014/24]Polyethylenzusammensetzung mit verbessertem Gleichgewicht zwischen Beständigkeit gegen langsames Risswachstum, Einflussleistung und Rohrdruckbeständigkeit für Rohranwendungen
Former [2014/24]Polyethylene composition with improved balance of slow crack growth resistance, impact performance and pipe pressure resistance for pipe applications
Former [2014/24]Composition de polyéthylène présentant un équilibre amélioré de résistance à la propagation des fissures lentes, la résistance aux chocs et une résistance à la pression des tuyaux pour des applications de tuyaux
Examination procedure21.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.09.2016Fee for grant paid
01.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
14.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
Opponent's representative
LyondellBasell
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
 02  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2020/11]
Former [2020/10]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
Opponent's representative
LyondellBasell
c/o Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Industriepark Hoechst, Bldg. E413
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
Opponent's representative
Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
 02  19.07.2017  28.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2017/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2017   
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
Opponent's representative
Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
 02  19.07.2017   
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Marsman, Hermanus Antonius M.
V.O.
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux N.V.
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH The Hague / NL
25.08.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.03.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
28.06.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.07.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition09.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2425/19
12.11.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2425/19
12.11.2019Statement of grounds filed
30.08.2019Appeal received No.  T2425/19
31.10.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
TR19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
NL01.01.2018
CZ05.12.2018
[2019/35]
Former [2018/45]HU05.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
TR19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
NL01.01.2018
Former [2018/43]HU05.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
NL01.01.2018
Former [2018/31]HU05.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2018/28]HU05.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/43]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV19.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1909014  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [XA]EP2072587  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4-9,13-17 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 11 * [A] 10-12;
 [X]WO2010049167  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * pages 3-5 *;
 [X]WO03087199  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * pages 7,15 *
by applicantEP0739937
 EP1920179
 US6770341
 US7345113
 EP1460105
 US4582816
 US3405109
 US3324093
 EP0479186
 US5391654
 US3374211
 US3242150
 EP1310295
 EP0891990
 EP1415999
 EP1591460
 WO2007025640
 US4933149
 EP0684871
 WO2005087261
 US4578879
 EP0600414
 EP0721798
 US4543399
 EP0699213
 WO9425495
 EP0696293
 WO0029452
 US4621952
 EP0188125
 EP0250169
 EP0579426
 US5026795
 US4803251
 US4532311
 US4855370
 EP0560035
 EP0707513
 EP0688794
 WO9951646
 WO0155230
 WO2006063771
 EP0428054
 WO9619503
 WO9632420
 WO0022040
    - SCHEIRS; BOHM; BOOT; LEEVERS, PE100 RESINS FOR PIPE APPLICATIONS, TRIP, (1996), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 408 - 415
    - "Conference on Polymer Processing (The Polymer Processing Society", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS AND FINAL PROGRAMME, (19970819), vol. 4, page 13
    - GELDART; BAYENS, "The Design of Distributors for Gas-fluidised Beds", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 42
    - JC. RANDALL'S, JMS - REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, no. 2&3, pages 201 - 317
    - HEINO, E.L.; LEHTINEN, A.; TANNER J.; SEPPALA, J.; NESTE OY, "Porvoo, Finland, Theor. Appl. Rheol.", PROC. INT. CONGR. RHEOL, (1992), vol. 1, pages 360 - 362
    - PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 701 - 754
OppositionWO0022040
 EP1909013  * ; *
 EP1655333  * ; *
 US7345113  * ; *
 WO0037556  * ; *
 WO2010104701  * ; and *
 WO2011082294  * . *
 US2008312380  * ; *
 WO2009147023  * . *
    - Hagström, "Prediction of melt flow rate (MFR) of bimodal polyethylene's based on MFR of their components", The Polymer Processing Society, Europe /Africa Region Meeting, Gothenburg, Sweden, (19970819), XP055273670
    - "Raise the bar on polyethylene pipe performance", CONTINUUM Polyethylene Resins for PE 4710/ PE 100 Pipe, (20100900), XP055401735
    - "Bimodal MDPE & HDPE - Strong Choices for Gas Pipe", Continuum Brochure Fast Facts - Plastics - North America, (20100500), pages 1 - 4, XP055401738
    - "Covering All the Bases in Polyethylene Pipe", Continuum Brochure - Bimodal Polyethylene Resins For Gas Pipe, (20070400), pages 1 - 4, XP055401741