EP2604775 - Form panel comprising a device for guiding a spacer stem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sateco Zone Industrielle 86110 Mirebeau / FR | [2015/07] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Sateco Zone Industrielle 86110 Mirebeau / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braud, Thierry 2, rue Gilbert Motheau 86190 Vouille / FR | 02 /
Micheneau, Patrick 23, rue Vergnale 79300 Bressuire / FR | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Argyma 46, rue Gambetta 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2013/25] | Argyma 44, rue de Bayard 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 12008223.5 | 10.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | FR20110061743 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1161743 | [2013/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604775 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604775 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G17/065, E04G17/06 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
E04G17/0642 (EP);
E04G17/002 (EP);
E04G17/0651 (EP);
E04G17/0652 (EP);
E04G2011/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | Schalwand, die eine Führungsvorrichtung für eine Verstrebungsstange umfasst | [2013/25] | English: | Form panel comprising a device for guiding a spacer stem | [2013/25] | French: | Banche de coffrage comportant un dispositif de guidage d'une tige d'entretoise | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2012 | AL | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | ES | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | IT | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | RS | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PT | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 11.02.2015 | |
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 11.02.2015 | |
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.02.2015 | |
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.02.2015 | |
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102010003017 (PERI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, paragraph 41 - page 8, paragraph 54; figure - *; | [A]EP1854941 (ROBUSTA GAUKEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 30; figure - *; | [A]FR2944329 (SATECO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2751358 (OUTINORD ST AMAND [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |