Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2493118

EP2493118 - Information processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2012/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Ohtake, Takamasa
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP
 [2012/35]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2016/49]
Former [2012/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12150011.002.01.2012
[2012/35]
Priority number, dateJP2011003666023.02.2011         Original published format: JP 2011036660
[2012/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2493118
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2493118
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L29/08
[2012/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
TitleGerman:Informationsverarbeitungssystem[2012/35]
English:Information processing system[2012/35]
French:Système de traitement d'informations[2012/35]
Examination procedure12.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
17.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2016Fee for grant paid
25.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2016
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.01.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MK07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU02.01.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CY07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU02.01.2012
AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
LU02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/38]AT07.12.2016
BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE07.12.2016
CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/31]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6633538  (TANAKA RYOJU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 59 * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 53 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 11 *;
 [A]WO2008013632  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 5, paragraph 27 - page 6, paragraph 29 * * page 7, paragraph 33 - paragraph 35 * * page 8, paragraph 38 * * page 10, paragraph 43 - paragraph 44 *;
 [A]WO2008049094  (ASTARO AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 10 - page 4, paragraph 15 *
by applicantJP2011036660