Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2476568

EP2476568 - Storage system for the storage of electric energy for a vehicle with electric propulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 27.07.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRARI S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
Modena / IT
[2012/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Favaretto, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri, 7/D
41043 Formigine / IT
[2012/29]
Representative(s)Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/23]
Former [2012/29]Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date12150996.212.01.2012
[2012/29]
Priority number, dateIT2011BO0000813.01.2011         Original published format: IT BO20110008
[2012/29]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2476568
Date:18.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2476568
Date:15.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60K1/04, B60K7/00, B60K6/00, H01M2/20, B60K6/48
[2013/34]
Former International [2012/29]B60K1/04, B60K7/00, B60K6/00, H01M2/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/29]
TitleGerman:Speichersystem für die Speicherung von elektrischer Energie für ein Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb[2012/29]
English:Storage system for the storage of electric energy for a vehicle with electric propulsion[2012/29]
French:Système de stockage pour le stockage de l'énergie électrique pour un véhicule avec propulsion électrique[2012/29]
Examination procedure13.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
29.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2013Fee for grant paid
29.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2013
Opposition(s)16.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
MC15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
PL15.01.2014
RO15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
SI15.01.2014
SK15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
GR16.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
[2016/28]
Former [2015/43]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
MC15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
PL15.01.2014
RO15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
SI15.01.2014
SK15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
PL15.01.2014
RO15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
SI15.01.2014
SK15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
PL15.01.2014
RO15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
SK15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
RO15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
CZ15.01.2014
DK15.01.2014
EE15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT15.01.2014
BE15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
HR15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
LV15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
RS15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
NL15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT15.01.2014
CY15.01.2014
ES15.01.2014
FI15.01.2014
LT15.01.2014
SE15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
PT15.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT15.01.2014
NO15.04.2014
IS15.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008050953  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al);
 [A]US7479346  (QUALLION LLC [US])
by applicant EP2199133
 IT2009BO00752