Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2620772

EP2620772 - Gastric cancer biomarkers and methods of use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2014
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.09.2014  [2014/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APP Latvijas Biomedicinas petijumu un studiju centrs
Ratsupites iela 1
1067 Riga / LV
[2013/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Line, Aija
Latvijas Biomedicinas petijumu un studiju centrs
Ratsupites iela 1
LV-1067 Riga / LV
02 / Kalnina, Zane
Latvijas Biomedicinas petijumu un studiju centrs
Ratsupites iela 1
LV-1067 Riga / LV
03 / Zajakins, Pavels
Latvijas Biomedicinas petijumu un studiju centrs
Ratsupites iela 1
LV-1067 Riga / LV
04 / Silina, Karina
Latvijas Biomedicinas petijumu un studiju centrs
Ratsupites iela 1
LV-1067 Riga / LV
 [2013/31]
Representative(s)Fortuna, Jevgenijs
Foral Patent Law Office
P.O. Box 98
1050 Riga / LV
[2013/31]
Application number, filing date12152404.525.01.2012
[2013/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2620772
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574
[2013/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Magenkrebsbiomarker und Anwendungsverfahren dafür[2013/31]
English:Gastric cancer biomarkers and methods of use thereof[2013/31]
French:Biomarqueurs du cancer gastrique et leurs procédés d'utilisation[2013/31]
Examination procedure21.02.2012Examination requested  [2013/31]
02.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/39]
29.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2013
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2009068628  (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [X] 1 * sequence 1495 *;
 [X]EP2107127  (UNIV JOSEPH FOURIER [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0063] , [0100]; sequence 180 *
 [X]  - Anonymous, "Homo sapiens (human) processing of precursor 5, ribonuclease P/MRP subunit (S. cerevisiae), isoform CRA_d", (20110904), URL: http://www.ebi.ac.uk/ena/data/view/EAW98208, (20120524), XP055028154 [X] 1 * the whole document *
by applicant   - CA CANCER J CLIN., (2008), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 71 - 96
    - GOSPODAROWICZ M; MACKILLOP W; O'SULLIVAN B ET AL., "Prognostic factors in clinical decision making: the future", CANCER, (2001), vol. 91, no. 8, pages 1688 - 1695
    - CREW KD; NEUGUT AI., "Epidemiology of gastric cancer", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL., (2006), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 354 - 362
    - TALLEY NJ; SILVERSTEIN MD; AGREUS L ET AL., "AGA technical review: evaluation of dyspepsia. American Gastroenterological Association", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1998), vol. 114, no. 3, pages 582 - 595
    - STURGEON CM; DUFFY MJ; HOFMANN BR ET AL., "National Academy of Clinical Biochemistry Laboratory Medicine Practice Guidelines for use of tumor markers in liver, bladder, cervical, and gastric cancers", CLIN CHEM., (2010), vol. 56, no. 6, page EL-48
    - KALNINA Z; SILINA K; LINE A, "Autoantibody Profiles as Biomarkers for Response to Therapy and Early Detection of Cancer", CURR CANCER THER REV., (2008), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 149 - 156
    - TURECI O; SAHIN U; PFREUNDSCHUH M., "Serological analysis of human tumor antigens: molecular definition and implications", MOL MED TODAY, (1997), vol. 3, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S1357-4310(97)01081-2, pages 342 - 349, XP000985587

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1357-4310(97)01081-2
    - KALNINA Z; SILINA K; MEISTERE I ET AL., "Evaluation of T7 and lambda phage display systems for survey of autoantibody profiles in cancer patients", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2008), vol. 334, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jim.2008.01.022, pages 37 - 50, XP022614832

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2008.01.022
    - WEX T; LEODOLTER A; BORNSCHEIN J ET AL., "Interleukin 1 beta (IL1B) gene polymorphisms are not associated with gastric carcinogenesis in Germany", ANTICANCER RES., (2010), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 505 - 511
    - LAXMAN B; MORRIS DS; YU J ET AL., "A first-generation multiplex biomarker analysis of urine for the early detection of prostate cancer", CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-3224, pages 645 - 649, XP002620319

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-3224
    - GREINER M., "Two-graph receiver operating characteristic (TG-ROC): update version supports optimisation of cut-off values that minimise overall misclassification costs", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1996), vol. 191, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(96)00013-0, pages 93 - 94, XP004020860

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(96)00013-0
    - GNJATIC S; NISHIKAWA H; JUNGBLUTH AA ET AL., "NY-ESO-1: review of an immunogenic tumor antigen", ADV CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 95, doi:doi:10.1016/S0065-230X(06)95001-5, pages 1 - 30, XP008073732

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-230X(06)95001-5
    - FUJITA S; WADA H; JUNGBLUTH AA ET AL., "NY-ESO-1 expression and immunogenicity in esophageal cancer", CLIN CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, no. 19, pages 6551 - 6558
    - SUGITA Y; WADA H; FUJITA S ET AL., "NY-ESO-1 expression and immunogenicity in malignant and benign breast tumors", CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 2199 - 2204
    - REUSCHENBACH M; VON KNEBEL DOEBERITZ M; WENTZENSEN N, "A systematic review of humoral immune responses against tumor antigens", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (2009), vol. 58, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1007/s00262-009-0733-4, pages 1535 - 1544, XP019738069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-009-0733-4
    - STOCKERT E; JAGER E; CHEN YT ET AL., "A survey of the humoral immune response of cancer patients to a panel of human tumor antigens", J EXP MED., (1998), vol. 187, no. 8, pages 1349 - 1354
    - KOZIOL JA; ZHANG JY; CASIANO CA ET AL., "Recursive partitioning as an approach to selection of immune markers for tumor diagnosis", CLIN CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, no. 14, pages 5120 - 5126