blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2448166

EP2448166 - Data retransmission method and wireless communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinohara, Chiaki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network
Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama
2-chome
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
02 / Obuchi, Kazuhisa
c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Suzuki, Masaaki
c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Otonari, Akihide
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network
Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama
2-chome
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
05 / Soejima, Yoshinori
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network
Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama
2-chome
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
06 / Yamasaki, Miki
c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network
Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama
2-chome
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
07 / Okamoto, Shinya
Technologies Limited
2-1, Momochihama
2-chome
Sawara-ku, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP
 [2012/18]
Representative(s)Hutchison, James
Haseltine Lake LLP
300 High Holborn
London, Greater London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2012/18]
Application number, filing date12152944.017.12.2008
[2012/18]
Priority number, dateJP2007033945028.12.2007         Original published format: JP 2007339450
[2012/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2448166
Date:02.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2448166
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04L1/18, H04L1/16, H04W72/00, H04L1/00
[2012/37]
CPC:
H04L1/0073 (EP,US); H04L1/16 (KR); H04W24/04 (US);
H04L1/1678 (EP,US); H04L1/1838 (EP,US); H04L1/1848 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2012/18]H04L1/18, H04L1/16, H04W72/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2012/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur erneuten Datenübertragung und drahtlose Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2012/18]
English:Data retransmission method and wireless communication apparatus[2012/18]
French:Procédé de retransmission de données et appareil de communication sans fil[2012/18]
Examination procedure06.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
12.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2016
18.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/27]
28.02.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/27]
03.05.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08171978.3  / EP2075944
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080171978) is  11.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
03.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006126960  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 10, line 12 - line 20 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 9 * * page 11, line 10 - line 25 *;
 [A]US2007168826  (TERRY STEPHEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] *;
 [A]WO9953631  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * page 10, line 3 - line 23 *;
 [A]EP1742432  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM JP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] *;
 [A]WO2007109256  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [Y]  - PANASONIC, "UL HARQ behaviour with dynamic adaptive/non-adaptive operation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-074928, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071031), vol. RAN WG1, no. Korea; 20071031, XP050108383 [Y] 1-8 * section 2, paragraphs 2 - 3 *
by applicantJP2007124682
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.