EP2522472 - Perforation unit of a packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEYPACK Verpackungstechnik GmbH Industriestrasse 3 48301 Nottuln-Appelhülsen / DE | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states MEYPACK Verpackungssystemtechnik GmbH Industriestrasse 3 48301 Nottuln-Appelhülsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostermann, Bernd Norderstraße 77 25436 Tornesch / DE | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 12153185.9 | 30.01.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | DE20112050107U | 11.05.2011 Original published format: DE 202011050107 U | [2012/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522472 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522472 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2522472 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/42, B26D5/16, B26F1/20, B65B61/18, B65B61/02, B65H35/08 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
B26D5/16 (EP);
B26F1/20 (EP);
B65B61/02 (EP);
B65B61/18 (EP);
B65H35/08 (EP);
B26D1/425 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Perforationseinheit einer Verpackungsmaschine | [2012/46] | English: | Perforation unit of a packaging machine | [2012/46] | French: | Unité de perforation d'une machine d'emballage | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 10.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | RS | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | LU | 30.01.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
IS | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008030489 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * * page 4, column 2, lines 1-16 *; | [A]DE69805103T (KVAERNER TECHNOLOGY & RES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-6 * * page 3, lines 4-13 *; | [A]US5540128 (CREADEN DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,9 *; | [A]US3641857 (CASTLE JEROME J VANDE) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 * |