blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2455473

EP2455473 - Disease resistant plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  09.07.2021
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enza Zaden Beheer B.V.
Haling 1E
1602 DB Enkhuizen / NL
[2021/32]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Enza Zaden Beheer B.V.
Haling 1E
1602 DB Enkhuizen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Damme, Mireille Maria Augusta
Morfelden-Walldorfplein 501
6706 LG Wageningen / NL
02 / Van Den Ackerveken, Augustinus Franciscus J.M.
Jacob van Lennephove 28
3438 PC Nieuwegein / NL
 [2012/29]
Former [2012/21]01 / Van Damme, Mireille Maria Augusta
Verversstraat 2G
1011 JA Amsterdam / NL
02 / Van Den Ackerveken, Augustinus Franciscus J.M.
Dijkgraafpolder 12
3991 ZC Houten / NL
Representative(s)Höpfner, Sebastian, et al
ZSP
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2021/32]Bird & Bird LLP, et al
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
Former [2015/48]van Kooij, Adriaan, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Former [2012/21]van Kooij, Adriaan, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelickplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12155885.230.01.2008
[2012/21]
Priority number, dateWO2007EP5097601.02.2007         Original published format: PCT/EP2007/050976
[2012/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2455473
Date:23.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2455473
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2455473
Date:11.08.2021
Language:EN
[2021/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/82, C12N9/02, A01H5/08
[2012/21]
CPC:
C12N15/8282 (EP); C12N9/0071 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/21]
TitleGerman:Krankheitsresistente Pflanzen[2012/21]
English:Disease resistant plants[2012/21]
French:Plantes résistantes aux maladies[2012/21]
Examination procedure17.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
14.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2015Fee for grant paid
04.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08707413.4  / EP2115147
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080707413) is  19.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.08.2016  20.01.2020  WITHDRAWN
Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V.
Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40
2678 KX De Lier / NL
 [2020/09]
Former [2016/50]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2016  12.09.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V.
Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40
2678 KX De Lier / NL
Former [2016/40]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2016   
Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V.
Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40
2678 KX De Lier / NL
Opponent's representative
Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis
Beethovenstraat 105 B
1077 HX Amsterdam / NL
06.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.07.2020Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.03.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.06.2021Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition27.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0561/18
26.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.07.2020Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
22.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0561/18
26.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.07.2020Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
21.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2008
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU30.01.2008
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU30.01.2008
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
IE30.01.2016
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
LU30.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
LU30.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/46]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
LU30.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/42]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
LU30.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
LU30.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT25.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0078981  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006032707  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * sequences 703,704,829,830 *;
 [A]WO0161021  (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [ID]  - DAMME VAN M ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF ARABIDOPSIS LOCI REQUIRED FOR SUSCEPTIBILITY TO THE DOWNY MILDEW PATHOGEN HYALOPERONOSPORA PARASITICA", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, APS PRESS, ST. PAUL, MN, US, (200506), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0894-0282, pages 583 - 592, XP008053420 [ID] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "Arabidopsis thaliana flavanone 3-hydroxylase-like protein (At5g24530) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20020415), Database accession no. AY081455, URL: EBI, XP002454001 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SKADHAUGE B ET AL, "The role of the barley testa layer and its flavonoid content in resistance to Fusarium infections", HEREDITAS, LUND, SE, (1997), vol. 126, no. 2, ISSN 0018-0661, pages 147 - 160, XP002081490 [A] 1-7 * page 159, column L; tables 1,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1601-5223.1997.00147.x
 [A]  - CHO ET AL, "Constitutive expression of the Flavanone 3-hydroxylase gene related to pathotype-specific ascochyta blight resistance in Cicer arietinum L", PHYSIOLOGICAL AND MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, GB, (200508), vol. 67, no. 2, ISSN 0885-5765, pages 100 - 107, XP005265989 [A] 1-7 * page 104, column L - page 106, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pmpp.2005.09.011
 [A]  - ARDI R ET AL, "Involvement of epicatechin biosynthesis in the activation of the mechanism of resistance of avocado fruits to Colletotrichum gloeosporioides", PHYSIOLOGICAL AND MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, (199811), vol. 53, no. 5-6, ISSN 0885-5765, pages 269 - 285, XP002453991 [A] 1-7 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/pmpp.1998.0181
 [A]  - MOSHER REBECCA A ET AL, "A comprehensive structure-function analysis of Arabidopsis SNI1 defines essential regions and transcriptional repressor activity.", THE PLANT CELL JUL 2006, (200607), vol. 18, no. 7, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1750 - 1765, XP002453995 [A] 1-7 * page 1753 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.105.039677
 [A]  - L. P. BRANDENBERGER ET AL, "Characterization of resistance of spinach to white rust (Albugo occidentalis) and downy mildew (Peronospora farinosa f. sp. spinaciae)", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (19940101), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 431 - 437, XP055022360 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - L. P. BRANDENBERGER ET AL, "Evaluation of Spinach Germplasm for Resistance to a New Race (Race 4) of Peronospora farinosa f. sp. spinaciae", HORTSCIENCE, (19921001), vol. 27, no. 20, pages 1118 - 1119, XP055022405 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9804586
 WO9945125
 WO9636697
 EP0474857
 WO9832325
    - VAN DAMME ET AL., MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (2005), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 583 - 592
    - MCCALLUM ET AL., "Targeted screening for induced mutations.", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, pages 455 - 457
    - HENIKOFF ET AL., "TILLING. Traditional mutagenesis meets functional genomics", PLANT PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 135, pages 630 - 636
    - TILL ET AL., "Mismatch cleavage by single-strand specific nucleases.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, pages 2632 - 2641
    - FRIEDRICH ET AL., MOL. PLANT MICROBE INTERACT., (2001), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 1114 - 1124
    - VAILLEAU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 15, pages 10179 - 10184
    - LACOMME; SANTA CRUZ, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 14, pages 7956 - 61
    - DE LAS MERCEDES DANA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 142, no. 2, pages 722 - 730
    - HOLUB, E. B. ET AL., MOL. PLANT MICROBE INTERACT., (1994), vol. 7, pages 223 - 239
    - HELLENS,R.P.; EDWARDS,E.A.; LEYLAND,N.R., BEAN,S.; MULLINEAUX,P.M., "pGreen: a versatile and flexible binary Ti vector for Agrobacterium-mediated plant transformation.", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 42, pages 819 - 832
    - DE JONG M.; VAN BREUKELEN B.; WITTINK,F.R.; MENKE,F.L.; WEISBEEK,P.J.; VAN DEN ACKERVEKEN G., "Membrane-associated transcripts in Arabidopsis; their isolation and characterization by DNA microarray analysis and bioinformatics.", PLANT J., (2006), vol. 46, pages 708 - 721
    - PARKER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1996), vol. 8, pages 2033 - 2046
    - ZIMMERMANN,P.; HENNIG,L.; GRUISSEM,W., "Gene- expression analysis and network discovery using Genevestigator.", TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2005), vol. 10, pages 407 - 409
    - GURR; RUSHTON, TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 275 - 282
    - DE WIT, ANNU. REV. PHYTOPATHOL., (1992), vol. 30, pages 391 - 418
    - GURR; RUSHTON, TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 283 - 290
OppositionWO2008092659
 WO2008092505
 WO0078981
    - MIREILLE VAN DAMME, "Genetic analysis of disease susceptibility in the Arabidopsis-Hyaloperonospora parasitica interaction.", PhD Thesis Utrecht, (20070527), ISBN 978-90-393-4515-3, pages 1 - 128, XP055305125
    - TIEME ZEILMAKER et al., "Functional and applied aspects of the DOWNY MILDEW RESISTANT1 and 6 genes in Arabidopsis", PhD Thesis Utrecht, (20120206), XP002730064
    - Monsanto Holland B.V., "Spinacia Oleracea L.", Naktuinbouw, (19950211), XP055305169
    - "TECHNICAL WORKING PARTY FOR VEGETABLES TWV/40/11", INTERNATIONAL UNION FOR THE PROTECTION OF NEW VARIETIES OF PLANTS, Guanajuato, Guanajuato State, Mexico, (20060616), vol. 40, XP055305174
    - Seminis Vegetable Seeds Holland B.V., "Spinacia oleracea L.", Naktuinbouw, (19961018), XP055305180
    - European Union Community Plant Variety Office, "Spinacea oleracea L. (SPINACH) CPVO-TP/55/6", PROTOCOL FOR DISTINCTNESS, UNIFORMITY AND STABILITY TESTS, (20020327), pages 1 - 17, XP055305183
    - "Spinacea oleracea L. Maracas", Naktuinbouw, (19960128), XP055305186
    - "Spinacea oleracea L. Marimba", Naktuinbouw, (19500000), XP055305188
    - M. VAN DAMME et al., "Identification of arabidopsis loci required for susceptibility to the downy mildew pathogen Hyaloperonospora parasitica.", Mol. Plant Microbe Interact., (20050000), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 583 - 92, XP008053420
    - SILVIA DIAS GUZZO, "Isolamente de genes de cafeeiro cv. Mundo Novo, associados à resistência sistêmica adquirida.", Aspectos bioquimicos e moleculares da resistência sistêmica adquirida em cafeeiro contra Hemileia vastatrix. PhD thesis São Paolo, (20040600), pages 85 - 95, XP055305190
    - SILVIA DIAS GUZZO, "Isolamente de genes de cafeeiro cv. Mundo Novo, associados à resistência sistêmica adquirida .", Aspectos bioquimicos e moleculares da resistência sistêmica adquirida em cafeeiro contra Hemileia vastatrix., São Paolo, (20040600), pages 85 - 95, XP055305190
    - <<>> functional studies of DMR6 in lettuce (filed during the examination proceedings)
    - <<>> multiple alignment of spinach DMR6 (S.oleracea) with known oxidoreductases
    - <<>> functional studies of DMR6 in spinach (filed during the examination proceedings)
    - <<>> data on sequence and resistance of spinach variants
    - <<>> Patentee's letter of 4 july 2013 filed during the examination proceedings and Appendix 1 thereto
    - <<>> NP_197841
    - Flanagan et al, "Using SIFT and PolyPhen to predict loss-of-function and gain-of-function mutations", Genet Test Mol Biomarkers, (201008), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 533 - 537
    - Sim et al, "SIFT web server: predicting effects of amino acid substitutions on proteins", Nucleic Acids Res., (201207), vol. 40, pages w452 - 457
    - <<>> analysis performed by Dr. Tieme Zeilmaker using the protein analysis program PROVEAN showing the A77S mutation to be neutral
    - <<>> Curriculum vitae of Dr. Tieme Zeilmaker
    - Wilmouth, Rupert C, "Structure and Mechanism of Anthocyanidin Synthase from Arabidopsis thaliana", Structure, (2002), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 93 - 103
    - Lukacin R and Britsch L, "Identification of Strictly Conserved Histidine and Arginine Residues as Part of the Active Site in Petunia hybridaFlavanone 3B-Hydroxylase", European Journal of Biochemistry, (1997), vol. 249, pages 748 - 757
    - <<>> Sequence alignment Spinacia oleracea DMR6 gene (SEQ ID 80) and DMR6 protein (SEQ ID (+) from EP2455473 with an alternative Spinacia oleracea DMR6 gene and DMR6 protein as identified in Spinacia oleracea L. accession SPI 173 (IPK, Gatersleben, Germany) and a number of spinach varieties
    - MIREILLE VAN DAMME, "Genetic analysis of disease susceptibility in the Arabidopsis-Hyaloperonospora parasitica interaction.", PhD Thesis Utrecht, (20070527), ISBN 978-90-393-4515-3, pages 1 - 128
    - "TECHNICAL WORKING PARTY FOR VEGETABLES TWV/40/11", INTERNATIONAL UNION FOR THE PROTECTION OF NEW VARIETIES OF PLANTS, Guanajuato, Guanajuato State, Mexico, (20060616), vol. 40
    - European Union Community Plant Variety Office, "Spinacea oleracea L. (SPINACH) CPVO-TP/55/6", PROTOCOL FOR DISTINCTNESS, UNIFORMITY AND STABILITY TESTS, (20020327), pages 1 - 17
    - M. VAN DAMME et al., "Identification of arabidopsis loci required for susceptibility to the downy mildew pathogen Hyaloperonospora parasitica.", Mol. Plant Microbe Interact., (2005), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 583 - 92
    - <<>> SYLVIA DIAS GUZZO: "Aspectos bioquimicos e moleculares da resistencia sistemica adquirida em cafeeiro contra Hemileia vastatrix", THESIS SUBMITTED FOR CENTRO DE ENERGIA NUCLEAR NA AGRICULTURA, UNIVERSIDADE DE Sao Paulo, pages 1 - 256, Retrieved from the Internet
    - Russell, G.E., "Some effects of inoculation with yellowing viruses on the susceptibility of sugar beet to fungal pathogens. I Susceptibility to Peronospora farinoso", Trans. Br. Mycol. Soc., (1966), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 611 - 619
    - <<>> Disease test results DMR6 Spinach mutants
    - <<>> Declaration of Dr. A. S. Rijpkema concerning functional complementation experiment
    - <<>> Curriculum Vitae of Dr. A.S. Rijpkema
    - J.Z. Zhang, "Overexpression analysis of plant transcription factors", Current Opinion in Plant Biology, (2003), vol. 6, pages 430 - 440
    - <<>> Instructions to the PhD candidates, Utrecht University
    - <<>> Declaration Dr. A. Verhage concerning the availability of O2
    - <<>> Declaration of Dr. A. Verhage
    - <<>> CV of Dr. A. Verhage
    - <<>> Choi et al, 2012
    - <<>> comparison SIFT and PROVEAN results
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.