Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2631201

EP2631201 - Method for determining when medicine packages are positioned incorrectly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson Rowa Germany GmbH
Rowastraße 1
53539 Kelberg / DE
[2018/01]
Former [2013/52]For all designated states
CareFusion Germany 326 GmbH
Rowastraße 1
53539 Kelberg / DE
Former [2013/35]For all designated states
Rowa Automatisierungssysteme GmbH
Rowastrasse 1 - 3
53539 Kelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hellenbrand, Christoph
Hauptstraße 23
56761 Kaifenheim / DE
02 / Klapperich, Andreas
Dornheck 41
56745 Rieden / DE
03 / Reif, Dennis
Pommerbachstraße 51
56759 Kaisersesch / DE
 [2013/35]
Representative(s)Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/35]Zenz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date12156529.522.02.2012
[2013/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2631201
Date:28.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2631201
Date:18.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/04, B65G1/137
[2014/08]
Former International [2013/35]B65G1/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ermitteln von Fehllagerungen von Arzneimittelpackungen[2013/35]
English:Method for determining when medicine packages are positioned incorrectly[2013/35]
French:Procédé pour déterminer le mauvais positionement de médicaments[2014/08]
Former [2013/35]Procédé de détermination de mauvaises positions de conditionnements de médicaments
Examination procedure03.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
04.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2014Fee for grant paid
06.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.03.2015   
PHARMAX
28 Parc d'Activités Raphele
83520 Roquebrune sur Argens / FR
Opponent's representative
Brizio Delaporte, Allison, et al
Cabinet Hautier
20, rue de la Liberté
06000 Nice / FR
 [2015/17]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0997/17
28.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.02.2012
AL18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU22.02.2012
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2017/39]HU22.02.2012
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2017/03]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2016/07]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/44]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
LU22.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/30]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/12]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY18.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0624528  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE202004004292U  (KHT KOMMISSIONIER UND HANDHABU [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1627830  (MOVING AB [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN201506600U  (BEIJING HUAKANG CHENGXIN MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *