Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2492124

EP2492124 - System for the storage of electric energy with reduced thickness for a vehicle with electric propulsion and vehicle with hybrid propulsion system with a corresponding storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 30.08.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016(Expected) grantpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferrari S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
Modena / IT
[2012/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Favaretto, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri 7/D
41043 FORMIGINE / IT
[2012/35]
Representative(s)Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/23]
Former [2012/35]Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date12156966.924.02.2012
[2012/35]
Priority number, dateIT2011BO0008124.02.2011         Original published format: IT BO20110081
[2012/35]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2492124
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2492124
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/04, H01M2/10, B60K1/04
[2015/36]
Former International [2012/35]B60K1/04, H01M2/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
TitleGerman:System mit verringerter Dicke zum Speichern von elektrischer Energie für ein Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb und Hybridantriebs-Fahrzeug mit einem entsprechenden Speichersystem[2015/36]
English:System for the storage of electric energy with reduced thickness for a vehicle with electric propulsion and vehicle with hybrid propulsion system with a corresponding storage system[2012/35]
French:Système pour le stockage d'énergie électrique avec une épaisseur réduite pour véhicule à propulsion électrique et véhicule a propulsion hybride avec un tel système de stockage[2012/35]
Former [2012/35]System mit verringerter Dicke zum Speichern von elektrischer Energie für ein Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb und Hybridantrieb-Fahrzeug mit einem entsprechenden Speichersystem
Examination procedure02.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
30.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2016Fee for grant paid
01.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1914216  (LUEDECKE EMIL) [Y] 2,6-9,11,13-14 l. 10-23 , p. 4 , par. 4 , p. 6 , fig. 1-3,5
 [XY]EP1710859  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,12-15 abstract , par. 0002 , fig. 1,2,5,24-27,35,40 [Y] 16
 [XY]JP2004262413  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-3,6-7,12,16 cl. 1 - par. 0002, 0035 , fig. 1-15 [Y] 4,8-16
 [Y]DE102008010823  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2,7-8,13-15 fig. 1-4,7 , par. 0001,0012,0013,0034-0036
 [Y]DE7343797U  (VARTA BATTERIE AG, 3000 HANNOVER (DE)) [Y] 2,4,6,12 par. 1 , p. 1 - p. 3 , l. 7 , p. 2 - l. 9 , fig. 1-3
 [Y]JP2009283193  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 9-10 par. 0002 , fig. 1-4
 [X]EP1936717  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,13-15 fig. 1-4,6 , par. 0001,0003,0046
 [X]US2009208828  (KANAI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,13 fig. 1,6 , par. 0002,0003,0054
 [I]JP2004262412  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [I] 1,12-13,16 fig. 3-11