Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2492178

EP2492178 - Bicycle suspension control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shimano Inc.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku
Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP
[2012/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Ichida, Tadashi
Simano Inc.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City
Osaka, 590-8577 / JP
02 / Ikemoto, Hideki
Shimano Inc.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City
Osaka, 590-8577 / JP
03 / Shirai, Toyoto
Shimano Inc.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City
Osaka, 590-8577 / JP
 [2012/35]
Representative(s)Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20a
80335 München / DE
Former [2012/35]Seidel, Marcus , et al
Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Nymphenburger Strasse 20
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12156983.424.02.2012
[2012/35]
Priority number, dateJP2011004306828.02.2011         Original published format: JP 2011043068
[2012/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2492178
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2492178
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:B62K25/04, B62K25/28, B62M25/08
[2012/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
TitleGerman:Fahrradaufhängungssteuerungsvorrichtung[2012/35]
English:Bicycle suspension control apparatus[2012/35]
French:Appareil de contrôle de suspension pour bicyclette[2012/35]
Examination procedure20.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/14]
05.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2014Fee for grant paid
08.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.06.2015  17.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Öhlins Racing AB
Box 722
194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB, et al
P.O. Box 665
831 27 Östersund / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2015  17.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Öhlins Racing AB
Box 722
194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB, et al
P.O. Box 665
831 27 Östersund / SE
Former [2016/02]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2015  17.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Öhlins Racing AB
Box 722
194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2015/30]
Opponent(s)01  17.06.2015   
Öhlins Racing AB
Box 722
194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE
Opponent's representative
Nilsson, Lars, et al
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 665
Studiegången 3
831 27 Östersund / SE
24.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1823/18
24.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
13.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1823/18
12.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.02.2012
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
GB24.02.2016
IT24.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2018/46]HU24.02.2012
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
GB24.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU24.02.2012
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
GB24.02.2016
Former [2017/38]HU24.02.2012
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
GB24.02.2016
Former [2017/08]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
GB24.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE24.02.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/47]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/44]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU24.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP2052960  (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 3 [I] 5-8;
 [XPAI]EP2309352  (CANNONDALE BICYCLE CORP [US]) [XP] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 3 [I] 5-8;
 [A]US2001030408  (MIYOSHI HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2005252330