EP2636643 - A method for fabricating a pyrolytic graphite film and the pyrolytic graphit film fabricated thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jones Tech PLC No.3 Dong Huan Zhong Lu Economical & Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Xiaoning No. 19 Purdu Temple West street Dong Cheng District Beijing / CN | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12158250.6 | 06.03.2012 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636643 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/04, C04B35/524 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
C01B32/205 (EP,US);
C04B35/524 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer pyrolytischen Graphitfolie und damit hergestellte pyrolytische Graphitfolie | [2013/37] | English: | A method for fabricating a pyrolytic graphite film and the pyrolytic graphit film fabricated thereby | [2013/37] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un film de graphite pyrolytique et film de graphite pyrolytique fabriqué selon ce procédé | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011169180 (INADA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraphs [0050] , [0064] , [6589] , [0090] , [0091] , [0114] - [0117]; figures 1,3,5,12; example A1; table 1 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]JP2004299937 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1,3,6,10,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,8 * [I] 2,4,5,7-9; | [XA]WO2010150300 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 12 * the whole document * * example 1; tables 4,5 * [A] 1-11; | [AD]US2011165379 (OHTA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS61275116 | JPH0375211 | US2011165379 |