Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2463283

EP2463283 - Fused phenyl Amido heterocyclic compounds for the prevention and treatment of glucokinase-mediated diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.04.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.01.2016  [2016/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bai, Hao
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / Nukui, Seiji
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / Zhou, Ru
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / Bailey, Simon
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / Bhumralkar, Dilip, Ramakant
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
06 / Bi, Feng
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
07 / Guo, Fengli
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
08 / He, Mingying
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
09 / Humphries, Paul, Stuart
Pfizer Global Research and Development
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
10 / Ling, Anthony, Lai
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
11 / Lou, Jihong
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/11]
Former [2012/24]01 / Bai, Hao
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
02 / Nukui, Seiji
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
03 / Zhou, Ru
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
04 / Bailey, Simon
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
05 / Bhumralkar, Dilip, Ramakant
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
06 / Bi, Feng
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
07 / Guo, Fengli
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
08 / He, Mingying
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
09 / Humphries, Paul, Stuart
Pfizer Global Research and Development
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT Connecticut CT 06340 / US
10 / Ling, Anthony, Lai
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
11 / Lou, Jihong
Pfizer Global Research and Development
10777 Science Center Drive
San Diego, CA California CA 92121 / US
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/33]
Former [2012/24]Rudge, Andrew John
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Application number, filing date12158318.111.04.2007
[2012/24]
Priority number, dateUS20060793703P20.04.2006         Original published format: US 793703 P
[2012/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2463283
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2463283
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, A61K31/41, A61K31/435, A61K31/495
[2012/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/24]
TitleGerman:Kondensierte Heterocyclische Phenylamidoverbindungen zur Prävention und Behandlung von durch Glucokinase vermittelten Krankheiten[2012/24]
English:Fused phenyl Amido heterocyclic compounds for the prevention and treatment of glucokinase-mediated diseases[2012/24]
French:Composés phényle amido-hétérocycliques fusionnés pour la prévention et le traitement de maladies à médiation par glucokinase[2012/24]
Examination procedure05.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
24.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2014Fee for grant paid
27.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07734354.9  / EP2010520
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070734354) is  24.08.2010
Opposition(s)12.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC11.06.2014
[2016/01]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004046139  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - line 9; claim 1; compound (I) *
by applicantUS6387938
    - PATINI ET AL., CHEM. REV, (1996), vol. 96, pages 3147 - 3176
    - THAVONEKHAM, B. ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1997), vol. 10, page 189
    - JONES, T. K. J., ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, pages 4595 - 4597
    - VAN BENTHEM, R. A. T. M.; MICHELS, J. J.; SPECKAMP, W. N., SYNLETT, (1994), pages 368 - 370
    - TOMASSY, B., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 28, page 1201
    - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, PERGAMON PRESS
    - Reminclton's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING, CO.
    - STILL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, page 2923