Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2502558

EP2502558 - Medical workstation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KUKA Deutschland GmbH
Zugspitzstraße 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
[2018/32]
Former [2015/46]For all designated states
KUKA Roboter GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
KUKA Laboratories GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Berke, Ralph
Keltenweg 22
86497 Horgau / DE
 [2018/39]
Former [2012/39]01 / Berke, Ralph
KUKA Laboratories GmbH
Rosenstrasse 11
86459 Gessertshausen / DE
Representative(s)Ege Lee & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Schirmgasse 268
84028 Landshut / DE
[2018/39]
Former [2012/39]Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR
Sigmundstraße 1
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12159485.714.03.2012
[2012/39]
Priority number, dateDE2011100591722.03.2011         Original published format: DE102011005917
[2012/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2502558
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2502558
Date:26.09.2018
Language:DE
[2018/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, A61B34/30
[2018/13]
Former International [2012/39]A61B5/06, A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Former [2012/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Medizinischer Arbeitsplatz[2012/39]
English:Medical workstation[2012/39]
French:Poste de travail médical[2012/39]
Examination procedure09.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
04.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2018Fee for grant paid
13.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2013
Opposition(s)27.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
IE14.03.2019
LU14.03.2019
BE31.03.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/09]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
IE14.03.2019
LU14.03.2019
Former [2020/01]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
LU14.03.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SI26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/46]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
MC26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
DK26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
SM26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
PT26.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
EE26.09.2018
ES26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
SK26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL26.09.2018
CZ26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
PL26.09.2018
RO26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
IT26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
IS26.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
NL26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL26.09.2018
FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI26.09.2018
HR26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
RS26.09.2018
SE26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
NO26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI26.09.2018
LT26.09.2018
NO26.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2009045827  (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1a-b,2 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0195]; figures 16,17 * * paragraph [0206] * [Y] 7,8,13;
 [Y]US2002120188  (BROCK DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,13 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0139] *;
 [A]US2005107808  (EVANS PHILIP C [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0135]; figures 2a-c * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0147]; figures 3a-4c * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0210] - paragraph [0211]; figure 30 * * paragraph [0217]; figure 33 * * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0222]; figure 35 * * paragraph [0448] - paragraph [0477] * * paragraph [0528] - paragraph [0539] *;
 [A]WO2005039391  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 13 * * page 9, line 19 - page 11, line 2 * * page 11, line 20 - page 13, line 17 * * page 15, line 12 - page 17, line 2; figure 6 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 12 * * page 20, line 7 - line 9 * * page 22, line 15 - page 23, line 8 *;
 [A]US6626832  (PALTIELI YOAV [IL], et al) [A] 1-7,9-13 * column 2, line 40 - line 59 * * column 4, line 15 - line 44; figure 1 * * column 5, line 5 - line 22 * * column 7, line 29 - line 44 * * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 46; figures 4b-d *;
 [A]US2005033161  (BIRKENBACH RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,9-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]WO2009045885  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 21, line 9 - line 25; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO03077101
by applicantWO2009065827