Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639997

EP2639997 - Method and system for secure access of a first computer to a second computer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATS Group (IP Holdings) Limited
30 de Castro Street
Wickhams Cay 1
P.O. Box 4519
Road Town, Tortola / VG
[2014/36]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
ATS Group (IP Holdings) Limited
30 de Castro Street
Wickhams Cay 1
P.O. Box 4519
Road Town, Tortola / VG
Inventor(s)01 / Wiesmaier, Alexander
c/o AGT Group (R&D) GmbH
Hilpertstr. 20A
64295 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Braun, Johannes
Im Boden 30
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
03 / Horsch, Moritz
Saalbaustr. 5
64283 Darmstadt / DE
 [2014/16]
Former [2013/38]01 / Wiesmaier, Alexander
c/o AGT Group (R&D) GbmH
Hilpertstr. 20A
64295 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Braun, Johannes
Im Boden 30
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
03 / Horsch, Moritz
Saalbaustr. 5
64283 Darmstadt / DE
Representative(s)Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP
16 Upper Woburn Place
London WC1H 0BS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP
15 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EF / GB
Former [2014/03]Börner, Robert , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2014/01](deleted)
...
Former [2013/38]Bittner, Peter , et al
Peter Bittner und Partner
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Application number, filing date12159764.515.03.2012
[2013/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639997
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639997
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
Extension statesBA29.01.2014
ME29.01.2014
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System für sicheren Zugriff eines ersten Computers auf einen zweiten Computer[2013/38]
English:Method and system for secure access of a first computer to a second computer[2013/38]
French:Procédé et système pour accès sécurisé d'un premier ordinateur à un second ordinateur[2013/38]
Examination procedure02.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/46]
27.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2014Fee for grant paid
01.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2014
Opposition(s)04.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.03.2012
AL03.09.2014
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MK03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU15.03.2012
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MK03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
Former [2017/39]HU15.03.2012
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
Former [2016/33]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE15.03.2015
LU15.03.2015
Former [2015/51]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU15.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU15.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
RS03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003204734  (WHEELER GRAHAM A [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0177788  (CLOAKWARE CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]WO0195545  (PHOENIX TECH LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2001055388  (KALISKI BURTON S [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [AD]  IVAN DAMGÃRD ET AL, Secure Multiparty AES, FINANCIAL CRYPTOGRAPHY AND DATA SECURITY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 367 - 374, ISBN 978-3-642-14576-6, XP019147508 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AD]  BUNDESAMT FÜR SICHERHEIT IN DER INFORMATIONSTECHNIK, "Technical Guideline TR-03110. Advanced Security Mechanisms for Machine Readable Travel Documents Extended Access Control (EAC), Password Authenticated Connection Establishment (PACE), and Restricted Identification (RI)", INTERNET CITATION, (20091109), page 107pp, URL: https://www.bsi.bund.de/cae/servlet/contentblob/532066/publicationFile/45359/TR-03110_v202_pdf.pdf, (20100129), XP007911385 [AD] 1-15 * pages 31-33 * * pages 52-54 *