blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2639997 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2639997



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 154
14.09.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
01.07.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
01.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
18.03.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
29.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
12.12.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
29.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.09.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.08.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.09.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 European search report Search / examination 3
22.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.06.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
22.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2012 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
15.03.2012 Description Search / examination 21
15.03.2012 Drawings Search / examination 6
15.03.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4