Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2478905

EP2478905 - Treatment of imatinib resistant leukemia using 4-aminoquinoline-3-carbonitriles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017-5755 / US
[2014/10]
Former [2012/30]For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hewes, Becker
45 Myrtle Terace
Winchester, MA Massachusetts 01890 / US
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/33]
Application number, filing date12160638.830.05.2008
[2012/30]
Priority number, dateUS20070932650P01.06.2007         Original published format: US 932650 P
[2012/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2478905
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2478905
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2478905
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4709, A61K31/496, A61P35/02
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/30]
TitleGerman:Behandlung von Imatinib-resistenter Leukämie unter Verwendung von 4-Aminochinolin-3-carbonitrilen[2012/30]
English:Treatment of imatinib resistant leukemia using 4-aminoquinoline-3-carbonitriles[2012/30]
French:Traitement de leucémie résistant à l'imatinib en utilisant des 4-aminoquinoline-3-carbonitriles[2013/50]
Former [2012/30]Traitement de leucémie résistant à l'imatinib en utilisant des 4-aminoquinoleine-3-carbonitriles
Examination procedure21.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/30]
18.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2014Fee for grant paid
24.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08769857.7  / EP2152267
Divisional application(s)EP14167958.9  / EP2777704
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080769857) is  24.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar EN6 1AG
Hertfordshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar EN6 1AG
Hertfordshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar EN6 1AG
Hertfordshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar EN6 1AG
Hertfordshire / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  16.02.2015  19.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar EN6 1AG
Hertfordshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo
SA19 6AS / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1011/17
22.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
[2016/21]
Former [2016/16]HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/50]HR14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]LT14.05.2014
NO14.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]LT14.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006124863  (IRM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 13,21,25 * paragraph [0026] *;
 [Y]US2003212276  (BOSCHELLI DIANE HARRIS [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 53 - column 106 *;
 [Y]US2005101780  (BOSCHELLI FRANK [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007056177  (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * paragraph [0071] *
 [XDY]  - PUTTINI, MIRIAM ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo Activity of SKI-606, a Novel Src-Abl Inhibitor, against Imatinib - Resistant Bcr - Abl + Neoplastic Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 66, no. 23, pages 11414 - 11322, XP002508641 [XD] 1-7,10,12,14-18,20,22-24 * abstract * * table 1 * [Y] 8,9,13,21,25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-1199
 [X]  - JABBOUR ELIAS ET AL, "New targeted therapies for chronic myelogenous leukemia: opportunities to overcome imatinib resistance", SEMINARS IN HEMATOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20070101), vol. 44, no. 1 Suppl. 1, ISSN 0037-1963, pages s25 - s31, XP009086255 [X] 1-7,10,12,14-18,20,22-24 * page 28, column R, paragraph 2 - page 29, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.seminhematol.2006.12.003
 [Y]  - BOSCHELLI, DIANE H. ET AL, "7-Alkoxy-4-phenylamino-3-quinolinecarbonitriles as Dual Inhibitors of Src and Abl Kinases", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 1599 - 1601, XP002508643 [Y] 8,9 * table 1 * * Scheme 3 * * page 1599, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM0499458
 [A]  - GUMIREDDY KIRANMAI ET AL, "A non-ATP-competitive inhibitor of BCR-ABL overrides imatinib resistance.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 8 FEB 2005, (20050208), vol. 102, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1992 - 1997, XP002508642 [A] 13,21,25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0408283102
 [A]  - BOSCHELLI, DIANE H. ET AL, "Investigation of the effect of varying the 4-anilino and 7-alkoxy groups of 3-quinolinecarbonitriles on the inhibition of Src kinase activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 13, no. 21, pages 3797 - 3800, XP002508644 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMCL.2003.07.001
 [A]  - JABBOUR, ELIAS ET AL, "Current and emerging treatment options in chronic myeloid leukemia", CANCER (HOBOKEN, NJ, UNITED STATES), (20070412), vol. 109, no. 11, pages 2171 - 2181, XP002508645 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * page 2176, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CNCR.22661
 [AD]  - MERCEDES E. GORRE ET AL., "Clinical Resistance to STI-571 Cancer Therapy Caused by BCR-ABL Gene Mutation or Amplification", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 876 - 880, XP002508646 [AD] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1062538
 [AD]  - LE COUTRE P ET AL, "Induction of resistance to the Abelson inhibitor STI571 in human leukemic cells through gene amplification.", BLOOD 1 MAR 2000, (20000301), vol. 95, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1758 - 1766, XP002508647 [AD] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GOLAS J M ET AL, "SKI-606, a 4-anilino-3-quinolinecarbonitrile dual inhibitor of Src and Abl kinases,Is a Potent Antiproliferative Agent against Chronic Myelogenous Leukemia Cells in Culture and Causes Regression of K562 Xenografts in Nude Mice", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD.; US, (20030101), vol. 63, no. 2, pages 375 - 381, XP002283612 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * the whole document *
 [A]  - B. J. SKAGGS ET AL, "Phosphorylation of the ATP-binding loop directs oncogenicity of drug-resistant BCR-ABL mutants", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20060101), vol. 103, no. 51, doi:10.1073/pnas.0609239103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 19466 - 19471, XP055047157 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * figure 1 * * page 19467, column r, paragraphs 1,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0609239103
 [A]  - SHAH NEIL P ET AL, "Mechanisms of resistance to STI571 in Philadelphia chromosome-associated leukemias", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20031020), vol. 22, no. 47, doi:10.1038/SJ.ONC.1206942, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 7389 - 7395, XP002441765 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * page 7394; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206942
 [A]  - SHAH N S ET AL, "MULTIPLE BCR-ABL KINASE DOMAIN MUTATIONS CONFER POLYCLONAL RESISTANCE TO THE TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR IMATINIB (STI571) IN CHRONIC PHASE AND BLAST CRISIS CHRONIC MYELOID LEUKEMIA", CANCER CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20020801), vol. 2, doi:10.1016/S1535-6108(02)00096-X, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 117 - 125, XP009005144 [A] 1-10,12-18,20-25 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1535-6108(02)00096-X
by applicantUS6297258
 US2005101780
 US6002008
 US6780996
    - CANCER CELL, (200208), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 117 - 125
    - GORE, SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, no. 5531, pages 876 - 880
    - LECOUTRE, BLOOD, (2000), vol. 95, no. 5, pages 1758 - 66
    - J MED., (20060615), vol. 354, no. 24, pages 2594 - 6
    - TALPAZ ET AL., "Dasatinib in Imatinib-Resistant Philadelphia Chromosome-Positive Leukemias", NEW ENGLAND J MED., (2006), vol. 354, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa055229, pages 2531 - 2541, XP055199163

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa055229
    - BLOOD, (20030701), vol. 102, no. 1, pages 276 - 283
    - J CLIN ONCOL., (20061120), vol. 24, no. 33, pages E51 - 2
    - PUTTINI ET AL., "have shown that SKI-606, a novel Src-Abl inhibitor is effective at reducing replication of imatininb resistant CML cell lines having certain mutations associate with imatinib resistance", CANCER RES. 2006, (20061201), vol. 66, no. 23
    - BOSCHELLI, D. H., J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, page 3965
    - BOSCHELLI, D. H. ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, page 822
    - BOSCHELLI, D. H. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2003), vol. 13, page 3797
    - BOSCHELLI, D. H., J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, page 1599