Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2522717

EP2522717 - Oligopeptide-free cell culture media [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Zählerweg 4
6300 Zug / CH
[2017/47]
Former [2017/08]For all designated states
Baxalta Incorporated
1200 Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxalta GmbH
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH
Former [2013/41]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare SA
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
Former [2012/46]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare SA
Hertistrasse 2
8306 Wallisellen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Grillberger, Leopold
Finsterergasse 1a
1220 Vienna / AT
02 / Reiter, Manfred
Gebrueder-Lang-Gasse 11/17
1150 Vienna / AT
03 / Mundt, Wolfgang
Florianigasse 57/1/2/6
1080 Vienna / AT
04 / Mitterer, Artur
Schwarzeckerweg 10
2304 Orth/Donau / AT
 [2012/46]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/46]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12160789.903.01.2007
[2012/46]
Priority number, dateUS20060756419P04.01.2006         Original published format: US 756419 P
[2012/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2522717
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2522717
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00
[2012/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/46]
Extension statesAL22.03.2012
BA22.03.2012
HR22.03.2012
MK22.03.2012
RS22.03.2012
TitleGerman:Oligopeptid-freie Zellkulturmedien[2012/46]
English:Oligopeptide-free cell culture media[2012/46]
French:Milieux de culture cellulaire sans oligopeptides[2012/46]
Examination procedure22.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
19.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2014Fee for grant paid
17.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07702574.0  / EP1974014
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070702574) is  26.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  05.01.2015  16.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Ursula Sprenzel
Rudolfshofer Strasse 17
91207 Lauf a.d. Pegnitz / DE
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 [2019/36]
Former [2018/32]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  05.01.2015  16.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Ursula Sprenzel
Rudolfshofer Strasse 17
91207 Lauf a.d. Pegnitz / DE
Opponent's representative
Mathys & Squire LLP, et al
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2016/20]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  05.01.2015  16.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Ursula Sprenzel
Rudolfshofer Strasse 17
91207 Lauf a.d. Pegnitz / DE
Opponent's representative
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2015/07]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014   
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  05.01.2015   
Dr. Ursula Sprenzel
Rudolfshofer Strasse 17
91207 Lauf a.d. Pegnitz / DE
Opponent's representative
Walcher, Armin, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
06.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1831/16
13.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1831/16
10.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC02.04.2014
[2015/43]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0659880  (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 5 - page 9 *;
 [AD]WO9815614  (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * claim 10 *;
 [A]US4767704  (CLEVELAND WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 12 *;
 [YP]WO2006045438  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [YP] 1-10 * claims 1, 14 *
 [Y]  - ZANG M ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT PROTEINS IN CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELLS USING A PROTEIN-FREE CELL CULTURE MEDIUM", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (199504), vol. 13, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 389 - 392, XP002032677 [Y] 1-10 * page 389 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0495-389
 [Y]  - KATSUTA H ET AL, "EFFECTS OF POLYAMINES ON THE PROLIFERATION OF MAMMALIAN CELLS IN TISSUE CULTURE", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL SCIENCE, TOKYO, JP, (197510), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0021-5031, pages 345 - 354, XP009058915 [Y] 1-10 * page 345 *
 [A]  - GABORIAU FRANCOIS ET AL, "Polyamine modulation of iron uptake in CHO cells", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (20040501), vol. 67, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.BCP.2003.12.033, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 1629 - 1637, XP002477218 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2003.12.033
by applicantWO9626266
 WO9615231
 WO9815614
 WO0123527
 WO0003000
 EP0481791
 WO9808934
    - FRANEK ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 688 - 692
OppositionEP0659880
 WO2006045438
 WO03029442
 WO2005035748
 WO02101019
 US2005272124
 WO9808934
 US5316938
 US4767704
 US5045468
 US4657866
 WO0123527
 WO2006026445
 EP0481791
 US5804420
 US5122469
    - ZANG M et al., "production of recombinant proteins in Chinese hamster ovary cells using a protein free cell culture medium", Bio/Technology, New York, US, (19950400), vol. 13, pages 389 - 392, XP002912251

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0495-389
    - KATSUTA H et al., "effects of polyamines on the proliferation of mammalian cells in tissue culture", Japanese Journal Of Experimental Medicine, Tokyo, JP, (19751000), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 345 - 354, XP009058915
    - KIM et al., "development of a serum free medium for the production of humanized antibody from Chinese hamster ovary cells using a statistical design", In Vitro Cell . Dev. Biol., vol. 34, pages 757 - 761, XP055314431

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11626-998-0029-6
    - MIYAZAKI et al., "spermine enhances IgM productivity of human-human hybridoma HB4C5 cells and human peripheral blood lymphocytes", Cytotechnology, (19980300), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 111 - 8, XP019236524

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007939213564
    - IGARASHI et al., "polyamines: mysterious modulators of cellular functions", Biochem Biophys Res Commun., (20000519), vol. 271, no. 3, pages 559 - 64, XP055314437

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.2601
    - PASTORIAN et al., "tolerance to putrescine toxicity in Chinese hamster ovary cells is associated with altered uptake and export", Exp Cell Res., (19970315), vol. 231, no. 2, pages 284 - 95, XP009163335

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/excr.1996.3467
    - Datasheet for 32500 DMEM/F-12 powder, Life Technologies
    - GANNE et al., "application of statistical design of experiments to the optimization of factor VIII expression by CHO cells", Cytotechnology, (19910000), vol. 6, pages 233 - 240, XP055314449

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00624762
    - R. HAM, "clonal growth of mammalian cells in a chemically defined synthetic medium", Microbiology, (19650000), vol. 53, pages 288 - 293, XP008058010

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.53.2.288
    - GRILLBERGER et al., "emerging trends in plasma free manufacturing of recombinant protein therapeutics expressed in mammalian cells", Biotechnol. J., (20090000), vol. 4, pages 186 - 201, XP055314457

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.200800241
    - FUSI et al., "effects of putrescine cadaverine spermine spermidine", Ital. J. Anim. Sci., (20080000), vol. 7, pages 131 - 140, XP055314464

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4081/ijas.2008.131
    - HAYTER et al., "glucose limited chemostat culture of Chinese hamster ovary cells producing", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (19920000), vol. 39, pages 327 - 335, XP001183149

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260390311
    - NOLASCO et al., "haemolytic uremic syndrome associated shiga toxins promote", Blood, (20050000), vol. 106, pages 4199 - 4209, XP055314468

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-05-2111
    - R.E. SPIER et al., Production of biologicals from animal cells in culture, Oxford, (19910000), pages 107 - 109, XP055314469
    - SUGAHARA et al., "effects of polyamines on proliferation and IgM productivity", Cytotechnology, (20080000), vol. 57, pages 115 - 122, XP019602494