Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2506147

EP2506147 - Epoll optimisations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solarflare Communications Inc
7505 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
[2012/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Pope, Steve
2704 Albatross Drive
Costa Mesa, CA California 92626 / US
02 / Riddoch, David
The Elms
9 Talls Lane
Fenstanton, Cambridgeshire PE28 9JJ / GB
 [2012/40]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2013/33]
Former [2012/40]Slingsby, Philip Roy
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date12161064.623.03.2012
[2012/40]
Priority number, dateUS201161470396P31.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161470396 P
[2012/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2506147
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2506147
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/54
[2012/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Epoll-Optimierungen[2012/40]
English:Epoll optimisations[2012/40]
French:Optimisations d'Epoll[2015/49]
Former [2012/40]Optimisations d'EPOLL
Examination procedure20.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
14.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2015
03.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
03.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination16.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1224/17
03.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP16155319.3  / EP3054382
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]  - "Epoll - I/O event notification facility", manpage, (20090201), URL: http://www.freebsd.org/cgi/man.cgi?query=epoll&apropos=0&sektion=0&manpath=SuSE Linux/i386 11.3&arch=default&format=pdf, (20121130), XP055046179 [I] 1-7,11-16 * page 1, line 1 - line 14 * * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line l *
 [I]  - XIANGYONG OUYANG ET AL, "Accelerating Checkpoint Operation by Node-Level Write Aggregation on Multicore Systems", PARALLEL PROCESSING, 2009. ICPP '09. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090922), ISBN 978-1-4244-4961-3, pages 34 - 41, XP031586421 [I] 1-7,11-16 * abstract * * page 3, column l, line 26 - column r, line 22 * * page 4, column r, line 9 - page 5, column r, line 14; figure 3 *
 [A]  - XIANGYONG OUYANG ET AL, "Fast checkpointing by Write Aggregation with Dynamic Buffer and Interleaving on multicore architecture", HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING (HIPC), 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091216), ISBN 978-1-4244-4922-4, pages 99 - 108, XP031649524 [A] 1-7,11-16 * page 102, column r, line 17 - page 103, column l, line 22; figure 3 *