Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2642403

EP2642403 - Interface device and method for consistent data exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klug, Andreas
Georg-Pohl-Str. 5
08141 Reinsdorf / DE
02 / Beyer, Hans-Jürgen
Poststr. 8
08134 Wildenfels / DE
03 / Bodenschatz, Markus
Erzgebirgsblick 75
09337 Hohenstein-Ernstthal / DE
 [2013/39]
Application number, filing date12161076.023.03.2012
[2013/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2642403
Date:25.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2642403
Date:23.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/40, G05B19/418
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/39]
TitleGerman:Schnittstellenvorrichtung und Verfahren für einen konsistenten Datenaustausch[2013/39]
English:Interface device and method for consistent data exchange[2013/39]
French:Dispositif d'interface et procédé d'échange stable de données[2013/39]
Examination procedure21.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
07.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.06.2014Fee for grant paid
04.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015  05.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FESTO AG & Co. KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
 [2018/17]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015   
FESTO AG & Co. KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kocher, Mark Werner
Magenbauer & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.02.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0630/17
16.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.03.2012
AL23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
AT23.03.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/40]HU23.03.2012
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
AT23.03.2017
Former [2018/31]HU23.03.2012
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/39]HU23.03.2012
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/51]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU23.03.2015
Former [2015/47]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU23.03.2015
Former [2015/46]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT23.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102010027286  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] , [0047] , [0091] *;
 [A]WO02086634  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0525214  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 20 *;
 [A]DE19909081  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19529718  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1253494
OppositionEP0525214
 DE19529718
 DE102010027286
 WO02086634
 DE19909081
 DE102008019277
 EP2197160
 DE102010020446
 DE102004039932
 DE102010001211
 DE102009032229
 DE102007054417
 DE10049049
 US2009199302
    - J. HEIDEPRIEM, Prozessinformatik 1 Grundzüge der Informatik, Oldenbourg Verlag, (20000000), pages 222 - 251, ISBN 3-486-27010-9, XP055274316
    - PROF. DR.-ING. HEINZ FRANK, "Industrielle Kommunikation mit Profinet", HS-heilbronn, (20091200), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.hs-heilbronn.de/1749571/PROFINET_2009_12_W1.pdf, XP055274386
    - M.POPP, "PROFINET Fundamentals", Profibus, (20150423), pages 12 - 15, URL: http://www.profibus.com/nc/pi- organization/regional-pi-associations/homepage-italia/events/storico- eventi/damdownload/pdw02-fundamentals-wolfgang- schroeder/download, XP055274387