Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2503320

EP2503320 - Composite sensor assemblies for single-use bioreactors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Finesse Solutions, Inc.
3501 Leonard Ct.
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/21]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Finesse Solutions, Inc.
71 Daggett Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-2109 / US
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Finesse Solutions, Inc.
71 Daggett Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-2109 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Selker, Mark
71 Daggett Drive
San Jose, CA California 95134-2109 / US
02 / Johnston, Timothy
71 Daggett Drive
San Jose, CA California 95134-2109 / US
03 / Paldus, Barbara
71 Daggett Drive
San Jose, CA California 95134-2109 / US
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2012/39]Benson, John Everett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12161078.623.03.2012
[2012/39]
Priority number, dateUS201161465849P25.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161465849 P
US20111313415731.05.2011         Original published format: US201113134157
[2012/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2503320
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2503320
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2503320
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, C12M1/34
[2014/18]
Former International [2012/39]G01N21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
TitleGerman:Verbundsensorbaugruppen für Einweg-Bioreaktoren[2012/39]
English:Composite sensor assemblies for single-use bioreactors[2012/39]
French:Ensembles de capteur composite destinés à des bioréacteurs à usage unique[2012/39]
Examination procedure29.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
16.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2014Fee for grant paid
29.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.07.2015   
SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH GMBH
August-Spindler-Strasse 11
37079 Göttingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 [2015/34]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.05.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1658/17
18.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.03.2012
AL08.10.2014
AT08.10.2014
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MK08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
SM08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU23.03.2012
AT08.10.2014
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MK08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
SM08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU23.03.2012
AT08.10.2014
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
SM08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
MT08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE23.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU23.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
IT08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI08.10.2014
HR08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RS08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT08.10.2014
NO08.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT08.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002179444  (LAUKS IMANTS R [CA]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] - [0053]; figures 1,4A * [I] 8,9,11,15;
 [I]WO2010010313  (NANOTEC SOLUTION [FR], et al) [I] 1-4,7-12,15 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 35; figures 4A,4B,9 *;
 [A]US2007157748  (BAUMFALK REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-12,15 * abstract *;
 [A]CN101812405  (NI HUI) [A] 1-12,15 * figure - *
by applicantUS6190913
 US7384783
 US2006240546
 US7489402
 US7935253
 US7824902
    - WILLIAM HARTZEL, "Materials of Construction for Single-Use Bioprocessing Systems", INNOVATIONS IN PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, (200704), page 46
    - M J SHENTON; M C LOWELL-HOARE; G C STEVENS, "Adhesion enhancement of polymer surfaces by atmospheric plasma treatment", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS, (2001), vol. 34, pages 2754 - 2760
    - G. M , K ABRAHAM; M SCHALDACH, "Quantitative ATR spectroscopy: some basic considerations", APPL. OPT., (1981), vol. 20, pages 1182 - 1190