Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2493186

EP2493186 - Method and system for improving compressed image chroma information including extended quantization parameter range function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.12.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94103 / US
[2012/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Demos, Gary A.
10720 Hepburn Circle
Culver City California 90232 / US
 [2012/35]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Schley, Jan Malte
Fish & Richardson P.C. Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date12161254.312.07.2002
[2012/35]
Priority number, dateUS2001090503912.07.2001         Original published format: US 905039
[2012/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2493186
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/12, H04N7/26, H04N7/30, G06T3/40, G06T9/00, H04N7/50
[2012/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2012/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung von komprimierten Bild-Chroma-Daten[2012/35]
English:Method and system for improving compressed image chroma information including extended quantization parameter range function[2012/35]
French:Procédé et système pour améliorer les informations de chrominance d'une image compressée[2012/35]
Examination procedure26.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
20.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
07.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.02.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination27.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1654/14
12.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02747000.4  / EP1405515
EP08075656.2  / EP1988712
EP10007124.0  / EP2239943
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5333212  (LIGTENBERG ADRIANUS [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 11 * * column 5, line 27 - line 38 *;
 [Y]EP0595562  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 21 *;
 [A]US5930386  (SAITO KAZUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2266635  (SONY BROADCAST & COMMUNICATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 12 - page 17, line 20; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]US5073820  (NAKAGAWA CHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4654696  (DAYTON BIRNEY D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 12, line 51 - line 60 *
 [Y]  - GISLE BJONTEGAARD ET AL, "Use of Higher QP for Chroma AC Coefficients", 11. VCEG MEETING; 22-08-2000 - 25-08-2000; PORTLAND, OREGON, US;(VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP OF ITU-T SG.16),, (20000816), no. q15k29, ISSN 0000-0463, XP030003122 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GISLE BJONTEGAARD ET AL, "Definition of New Coding Elements from Telenor", 10. VCEG MEETING; 16-05-2000 - 19-05-2000; OSAKA, JP; (VIDEO CODINGEXPERTS GROUP OF ITU-T SG.16),, (20000509), no. q15j28, ISSN 0000-0466, XP030003057 [A] 1-10 * page 17, paragraph 4.3.3 *
 [A]  - RIJKSE K ET AL, "Report of General Video Ad Hoc Committee", 11. LBC MEETING;17-10-1995 - 20-10-1995; DARMSTADT; (ITU LOW BITRATECODING GROUP),, (19951017), no. LBC-95-251, ISSN 0000-0116, XP030028595 [A] 1-10 * page 16, paragraph 5.3.6; table 8/H.263 *
by applicantWO02071735
    - GARY DEMOS, "The Use of Logarithmic and Density Units for Pixels", SMPTE JOURNAL, (199010), vol. 100, no. 10
 US20010798346